California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Julia W Brand
Case #: 2:24-bk-13587
Case Filed:May 08, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Jun 04, 2024
Dismissed:May 30, 2024
Terminated:Jun 18, 2024

Debtor
FCM Gold And Diamond, Inc
539 N Glenoaks Blvd
Burbank, CA 91502-3201
Represented By
FCM Gold And Diamond, Inc
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Howard M Ehrenberg (TR)
1875 Century Park East Suite 1900
Los Angeles, CA 90067
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 05/08/2024 12:05 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
1 1 6 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 05/08 9:27 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by FCM Gold And Diamond, Inc Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 5/22/2024. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 5/22/2024. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 5/22/2024. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 5/22/2024. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 5/22/2024. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 5/22/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 5/22/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 5/22/2024. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 5/22/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 5/22/2024. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 5/22/2024. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 5/22/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 5/22/2024. (BT) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2024 (BT)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Wed 05/08 9:30 AM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Ehrenberg (TR), Howard M with 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/4/2024 at 11:00 AM via Zoom - Ehrenberg: Meeting ID 533 861 1826, Passcode 7827374051, Phone 1 213 592 2649. (BT)
Related: [-]