Minnesota District Court
Judge:Patrick J Schiltz
Referred: David T Schultz
Case #: 0:24-cv-01678
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:May 08, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 04, 2024 2:42 AM CST
Defendant
Dearborn National Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Kristina Holmstrom
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Paola K. Maldonado
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Nathan T Boone
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sarena Anderson
Represented By
Jeff Schleeter
Fields Law Firm
contact info
Zachary Schmoll
Fields Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, December 06, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution Fri 12/06 9:30 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION as CO-COUNSEL for Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. (Vassel, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 08/20 10:05 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER granting13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kristina Holmstrom for Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/20/2024. (jam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
13 13 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/15 4:01 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kristina Holmstrom. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-11267416 filed by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. (Maldonado, Paola)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
12 12 order Order/Notice to Attorney Wed 08/14 2:33 PM
ORDER REGARDING LR 5.6. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/14/2024. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ex 1,
Att: 2 ex 2
11 11 order Scheduling Order Wed 08/14 2:28 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2024. Motions (non-disp) due 11/1/2024. Motions (disp) HEARD by 7/1/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/14/2024. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution Tue 08/13 8:49 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. (Maldonado, Paola)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
9 9 order Order Cancelling Deadline & Hearing Wed 08/07 5:44 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER Cancelling Deadline & Hearing. Pretrial scheduling conference set for 8/13/24 is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/7/2024. (TJB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
8 8 misc Rule 26(f) Report Tue 08/06 4:23 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Sarena Anderson.(Boone, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
7 7 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Wed 07/10 12:37 PM
ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 8/6/2024. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/6/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/10/2024.(TJB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
Monday, July 08, 2024
6 6 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Mon 07/08 1:21 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. (Boone, Nathan)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/08 1:17 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. (Boone, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 05/22 4:59 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sarena Anderson. Dearborn National Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 5/21/2024, answer due 7/22/2024. (Bauer, Blake)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 05/08 3:41 PM
Summons Issued as to Dearborn National Life Insurance Company. (MMP)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Wed 05/08 3:39 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 24-cv-1678 (PJS/DTS). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MMP)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/08 3:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Dearborn National Life Insurance Company (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11037949) filed by Sarena Anderson. Filer requests summons issued.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Schleeter, Jeff) Modified text on 5/8/2024 (MMP)