California Northern District Court
Judge:William H Orrick
Case #: 3:24-cv-02760
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:May 08, 2024
Terminated:Dec 17, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 04, 2024 12:46 AM PST
Defendant
Reddit, Inc.
Represented By
Dale Richard Bish
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Mikaela Burkhardt
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich Rosati
contact info
Plaintiff
Levelfields, Inc.
Represented By
David J Koppelman
Koppelman Law Firm
contact info
Alfredo Torrijos
Haffner Law PC
contact info
Trevor W Weinberg
Haffner Law PC
contact info
Joshua H. Haffner
Haffner Law PC
contact info

GPO Dec 17 2024
ORDER GRANTING 37 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2024)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
49 49 appeal USCA Case Number Wed 01/22 11:35 AM
USCA Case Number 25-394 for48 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Levelfields, Inc. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
48 48 appeal Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit Wed 01/15 10:50 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Levelfields, Inc.. (Appeal fee of $605 receipt number ACANDC-20238300 paid.) (Weinberg, Trevor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
47 47 misc Transcript Wed 01/08 1:52 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/10/2024, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Stephen W. Franklin, telephone number (561)313-8439. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2025. (Franklin, Stephen)
Related: [-] 46 Transcript Order (s)46
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
46 46 misc Transcript Order Wed 12/18 9:17 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/10/2024 before Judge William H. Orrick by Levelfields, Inc., for Court Reporter Stephen Franklin. (Torrijos, Alfredo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
45 45 order Judgment Terminate Civil Case Tue 12/17 5:45 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/17/2024. (jmd, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
44 44 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 12/17 5:29 PM
ORDER GRANTING 37 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmd, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
43 43 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 12/10 12:46 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 12/10/2024 re 37 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion taken under submission; written order to follow. Total Time in Court: 7 minutes. Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin. Plaintiff Attorney: Alfredo Torrijos. Defendant Attorney: Dale R. Bish and Cole Gray. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/10/2024)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
42 42 misc Joint Case Management Statement Tue 12/03 3:08 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Reddit, Inc.. (Bish, Dale)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
41 41 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Mon 11/25 5:18 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byReddit, Inc.. (Bish, Dale)
Related: [-] 37 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 34
Monday, November 11, 2024
40 40 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 11/11 11:06 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byLevelfields, Inc.. (Torrijos, Alfredo)
Related: [-] 37 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 34
Monday, November 04, 2024
39 39 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Mon 11/04 1:48 PM
CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING ZOOM HEARING - Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing as to 37 MOTION to Dismiss reset for 12/10/2024 10:00 AM before Judge William H. Orrick. This proceeding will be held via Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
38 38 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Mon 10/14 6:53 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re37 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 34 filed byReddit, Inc.. Related [+] (Bish, Dale)
Related: [-] 37
Att: 1 Proposed Order
37 37 motion Dismiss Mon 10/14 6:43 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 34 filed by Reddit, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 12/11/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Responses due by 11/11/2024. Replies due by 11/25/2024.(Bish, Dale)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Mikaela K. Burkhardt,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Reddit's Privacy Policy,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - IAB Glossary for Digital Media Buying & Planning,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - IAB Click Measurement Guidelines Version 1.0,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Friday, September 20, 2024
36 36 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 09/20 1:41 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER FOR MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AS AMENDED by Judge William H. Orrick granting 35 Stipulation. Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2024. Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2024 02:00 PM via Videoconference. (jmd, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
35 35 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 09/19 2:01 PM
JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] SCHEDULING ORDER FOR MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Reddit, Inc..(Bish, Dale)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Mikaela Burkhardt In Support of Joint Stipulation
Monday, September 16, 2024
34 34 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 09/16 11:03 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Reddit, Inc.. Filed by Levelfields, Inc.. (Torrijos, Alfredo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
33 33 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Tue 08/27 1:29 PM
CLERKS NOTICE RE ZOOM HEARING - Case Management Conference reset for 11/12/2024 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2024. This proceeding will be held via Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
32 32 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 08/27 12:27 PM
Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 21 Motion to Dismiss. Any amended complaint shall be filed within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. (jmd, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
31 31 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Tue 08/27 9:25 AM
CLERKS NOTICE RE ZOOM HEARING. The Motion to Dismiss hearing and Case Management Conference set for 08/28/2024 at 2:00 p.m. will be held via Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
30 30 misc Case Management Statement Wed 08/21 6:01 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT by Parties and Counsel filed by Reddit, Inc.. (Bish, Dale)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
29 29 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 07/24 9:25 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge William H. Orrick granting 28 Stipulation. Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2024. Case Management Conference reset for 8/28/2024 02:00 PM to coincide with motion hearing. (jmd, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
28 28 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 07/23 2:52 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Reddit, Inc..(Burkhardt, Mikaela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
27 27 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 07/17 2:49 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Weinberg, Trevor)
Related: [-]
26 26 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Wed 07/17 11:17 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (Burkhardt, Mikaela)
Related: [-]
25 25 adr ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance after 5/1/2018 Wed 07/17 9:48 AM
ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
24 24 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Tue 07/09 2:28 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byReddit, Inc.. (Bish, Dale)
Related: [-] 21 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Class Action Complaint
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/03 1:29 PM
NOTICE by Levelfields, Inc. of Errata regarding Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss of Defendant Reddit, Inc. (Weinberg, Trevor)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Wed 07/03 5:09 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byLevelfields, Inc.. (Torrijos, Alfredo)
Related: [-] 21 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Class Action Complaint
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
21 21 motion Dismiss Tue 06/18 3:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss 1 Class Action Complaint filed by Reddit, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 8/28/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Responses due by 7/2/2024. Replies due by 7/9/2024.(Bish, Dale)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Mikaela Burkhardt,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Friday, June 07, 2024
20 20 order Case Management Scheduling Order Fri 06/07 8:27 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2024 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2024. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 6/7/2024. (jmd, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 06/06 8:52 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 6/6/2024.(anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
4 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/22/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Levelfields, Inc. . (Weinberg, Trevor)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Weinberg, Trevor)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Reddit, Inc. a California Corporation ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19397177.). Filed by Levelfields, Inc.. (Weinberg, Trevor)
Related: [-]