Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Maria Ellena Chavez-Ruark
Case #: 0:24-bk-13955
Case Filed:May 08, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
W. F. Delauter & Son, Inc.
PO Box 114
Thurmont, MD 21788-0114
Represented By
Paul Sweeney
Yvs Law, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee - Greenbelt
6305 Ivy Lane, Suite 600
Greenbelt, MD 20770


Docket last updated: 05/07/2024 8:00 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
crditcrd none Wed 05/08 7:55 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-13955 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt number A42204922. Fee amount 1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 40 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) - Case Opening Wed 05/08 7:52 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual . Fee Amount $1738 Filed by W. F. Delauter & Son, Inc.. Chapter 11 Plan Exclusivity expires 09/5/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/4/2024. Schedule A/B due 05/22/2024. Schedule D due 05/22/2024. Schedule E/F due 05/22/2024. Schedule G due 05/22/2024. Schedule H due 05/22/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/22/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 05/22/2024. Incomplete Filings due 05/22/2024 (Sweeney, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 8 pgs motion Joint Administration Wed 05/08 9:15 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by W. F. Delauter & Son, Inc.. (Sweeney, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Proposed Order
3 3 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Wed 05/08 9:20 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Paul Sweeney. (Sweeney, Paul)
Related: [-]
4 4 7 pgs motion Employ Wed 05/08 9:32 PM
Application to Employ YVS Law, LLC as Counsel for Debtor and Verified Statement of Proposed Party Filed by W. F. Delauter & Son, Inc.. (Sweeney, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Verified Statement of Paul Sweeney
Att: 2 Proposed Order
5 5 6 pgs motion Employ Wed 05/08 9:53 PM
Application to Employ George S. Magas CPA PC as Accountant to the Debtor and Verified Statement of Proposed Party Filed by W. F. Delauter & Son, Inc.. (Sweeney, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Proposed Order
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/08 10:31 PM
Motion for Administrative Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 328 and 331 Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Chapter 11 Professionals Filed by W. F. Delauter & Son, Inc.. (Sweeney, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/08 10:55 PM
Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 102(1) and 105(a) and Bankruptcy Rules 2002(m) and 9007 to Establish Noticing Procedures Filed by W. F. Delauter & Son, Inc.. (Grasso, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Notice of Motion
8 8 court Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Wed 05/08 11:55 PM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a)
Related: [-]