New York Northern District Court
Judge:Mae A D'Agostino
Referred: Christian F Hummel
Case #: 1:24-cv-00632
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 07, 2024
Terminated:Aug 08, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 03, 2024 3:39 AM EST
Defendant
Federal Bureau Investigation
Plaintiff
Michael Brandon Story
56 Shelterwood Rd Apt A
East Greenbush, NY 12061


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, August 08, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Thu 08/08 2:50 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE granting6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Michael Brandon Story. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 8/8/2024. (Copy served via regular mail upon plaintiff)(ban)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 08/05 2:39 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Michael Brandon Story. (hmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
5 5 order Order on Notice of Potential Related Case Wed 05/08 4:11 PM
TEXT ORDER granting Direct Assignment. The cases are deemed related 1:24-cv-623, 1:24-cv-625, 1:24-cv-626, and 1:24-cv-627, 1:24-cv-631, 1:24-cv-632 MAD/CFH. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 05/08/2024. (Copy served via regular mail upon plaintiff)(ban)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice Regarding Judge D'Agostino Case Disposition Pilot (Text-Only) Wed 05/08 11:17 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf . (sbb)
Related: [-]
motion Notice of Potential Related Case for Judicial Review Wed 05/08 11:20 AM
TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 1:24-cv-00623, 1:24-cv-00625, 1:24-cv-00627, 1:24-cv-00631. (sbb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
3 3 misc Pro Se Handbook and Notice Issued Wed 05/08 11:16 AM
PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained to Plaintiff at time complaint was filed over the counter on 5/7/2024. (sbb)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/08 11:15 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Brandon Story. Attached is Proposed Summons as to Defendant FBI. Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (sbb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons as to FBI
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/08 11:13 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Federal Bureau Investigation filed by Michael Brandon Story.(sbb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet