Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-03216
Case Filed:May 06, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 09, 2024 12:47 AM MST
Defendant
Agustin Sanchez-Gonzalez (1)
Represented By
Samuel Ali-Sondiata Washington
Law Office Of Samuel Washington
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jose Ruben Solis, Jr.
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2024 2:10 AM MST
Saturday, May 04, 2024
Arrest of Agustin Sanchez-Gonzalez on 5/4/2024. (CMB)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Agustin Sanchez-Gonzalez. (CMB)
Related: [-]