Missouri Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-05012
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 09, 2024 3:09 AM CDT
Defendant
Efrain Cuz-Xol (1)
Represented By
Ian A. Lewis
Federal Public Defender'S Office - Springfield
contact info
Paul Robert Duchscherer
Federal Public Defender'S Office - Springfield
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Casey Michael Clark
United States Attorney'S Office-Spgfd
contact info

GPO May 14 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Efrain Cuz-Xol. Objections to R&R due by 5/28/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Berziel, Karla)
GPO May 29 2024
ACCEPTANCE of Plea of guilty and Adjudication of Guilt re25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Efrain Cuz-Xol (1). (Berziel, Karla)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2024 4:49 AM CDT
Friday, March 29, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Efrain Cuz-Xol (1). (Furtak, Rebecca) [6:24-mj-02025-DPR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A,
Att: 2 Attachment B
Monday, April 01, 2024
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David P. Rush: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Efrain Cuz-Xol held on 4/1/2024. Time in court: 9:33 a.m. to 9:39 a.m. Name of interpreter: Lisa Lewis. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Karla Berziel, 417-865-3869. DEFENDANT IN CUSTODY. (Berziel, Karla) [6:24-mj-02025-DPR]
Related: [-]
3 3 PRO SE MOTION to appoint counsel by Efrain Cuz-Xol. (Berziel, Karla) [6:24-mj-02025-DPR]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting 3 pro se motion to appoint counsel. Ian A. Lewis for Efrain Cuz-Xol appointed. (Berziel, Karla) [6:24-mj-02025-DPR]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Efrain Cuz-Xol. This is the official notice for this hearing. Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing set for 4/4/2024 9:30 AM in MJ Courtroom, Springfield (DPR) before Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berziel, Karla) [6:24-mj-02025-DPR]
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION for detention hearing by USA as to Efrain Cuz-Xol. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/15/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Clark, Casey) [6:24-mj-02025-DPR]
Related: [-]
8 8 BOND REPORT as to Efrain Cuz-Xol. Document is available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter PACER login and password first for authentication. (Wells, Lyndsey) [6:24-mj-02025-DPR]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Paul Robert Duchscherer appearing for Efrain Cuz-Xol. (Attorney Paul Robert Duchscherer added to party Efrain Cuz-Xol(pty:dft))(Duchscherer, Paul) [6:24-mj-02025-DPR]
Related: [-]
10 10 ARREST WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED on 4/1/2024 as to Efrain Cuz-Xol. Pursuant to the E-Government Act and Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure 49.1(a), access to this document is restricted to case participants and the court. (Hanna, Jaime) [6:24-mj-02025-DPR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
11 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David P. Rush: PRELIMINARY HEARING and DETENTION HEARING as to Efrain Cuz-Xol held on 4/4/2024. Defendant in CUSTODY. Time in court: 9:42 a.m. to 9:49 a.m.. Name of interpreter: Lisa Lewis. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Karen Siegert, 417-225-7701. (Siegert, Karen) [6:24-mj-02025-DPR]
Related: [-]
12 12 Waiver of Certified Interpreter by Efrain Cuz-Xol (Siegert, Karen) [6:24-mj-02025-DPR]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER as to Efrain Cuz-Xol. Signed on 4/4/24 by Magistrate Judge David P. Rush.(Siegert, Karen) Modified on 4/5/2024. (Main Document 13 replaced on 4/5/2024). Original filing was a duplicate of Doc. # 12. CM/ECF Notice regenerated to all parties. (Burch, Steve) [6:24-mj-02025-DPR]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
14 14 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Efrain Cuz-Xol (1). (Berziel, Karla) [6:24-mj-02025-DPR]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
15 15 INDICTMENT as to Efrain Cuz-Xol (1) count(s) 1. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
16 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David P. Rush as to Efrain Cuz-Xol. Signed on 4/9/2024 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER AUTHORIZING TEMPORARY TRANSFER OF CUSTODY ON CONSENT as to Efrain Cuz-Xol. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]