Original Case: 8:16-cv-00929

Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cvpri-01798
Typecivil private
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Case Filed:May 08, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 09, 2024 5:21 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
INCSTORES LLC
Represented By
Matthew A. Pequignot
Pequignot Myers LLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
THE PARALLAX GROUP INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Represented By
Joseph Andelin
Fish IP Law, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2024 4:15 AM EDT
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 05/02/2024. [1002972] Entry of Appearance due 05/22/2024. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/22/2024. Docketing Statement due 05/22/2024. Appellant's brief is due 07/08/2024. [MMA] [Entered: 05/08/2024 03:55 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 117 pgs Civil Case Docketed