Hawaii Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert J Faris
Case #: 1:24-bk-00438
Case Filed:May 08, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Jun 05, 2024
Dismissed:May 30, 2024
Terminated:Jul 11, 2024

Debtor
Akamai Wash N Dry LLC
75-5804 Kini Loop
Kailua Kona, HI 96740-2018
Represented By
Akamai Wash N Dry LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Richard A. Yanagi
Richard A. Yanagi, Chapter 7 Trustee P.O. Box 25595
Honolulu, HI 96825
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee.
300 Ala Moana Boulevard Room 4108
Honolulu, HI 96850


Docket last updated: 05/09/2024 12:00 AM HST
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
1 1 court z Ch 7 Petition Received (VOLUNTARY) Wed 05/08 11:24 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Received. LLC Authority to File Petition due 5/22/2024. Schedule A/B due 5/22/2024. Schedule D due 5/22/2024. Schedule E/F due 5/22/2024. Schedule G due 5/22/2024. Schedule H due 5/22/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/22/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 5/22/2024.Incomplete Filings due by 5/22/2024. (LC)
Related: [-]
2 2 court AUTOMATIC Meeting of Creditors 7 (Corp/P NO Assets) Wed 05/08 11:28 AM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors and Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Yanagi, Richard A. with 341(a)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc 1 Ch 7 Voluntary Petition Wed 05/08 11:42 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, Without All Required Schedules/Statements - See Docket Entry # 1 For Documents Due. (LC)
Related: [-]
4 4 court AUTOMATIC Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) Wed 05/08 4:50 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Filing Fee - $338.00 by LC. Receipt Number 10000137. (CashRegs)
Related: [-]