California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 15
Judge:Deborah J Saltzman
Case #: 2:24-bk-13625
Case Filed:May 09, 2024

Debtor
Deelish Brands Pte. Ltd. (In Creditors' Voluntary Liquidation)

,
Represented By
Kimberly S Fineman
Finestone Hayes LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 23 minutes ago
Thursday, June 20, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 06/20 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 ORDER Re: Recognition of the Foreign Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
13 13 3 pgs order ORDER Re: Recognition of the Foreign Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Tue 06/18 3:28 PM
Order on Debtor's Chapter 15 Petition For Recognition of a Foreign Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 6/18/2024 (MB2)
Related: [-] 11
Thursday, June 13, 2024
12 12 court Hearing Held (Motion) Thu 06/13 11:22 PM
Hearing Held Related [+]. COURT RULING: Grant. (MB2)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for Order Scheduling Hearing on Chapter 15 Petition and Specifying Form and Manner of Service filed by Debtor Deelish Brands Pte. Ltd. (In Creditors' Voluntary Liquidation)
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
11 11 motion Stipulation (motion) Wed 05/29 6:10 PM
Stipulation By Deelish Brands Pte. Ltd. (In Creditors' Voluntary Liquidation) and Fatburger North America, Inc. to Incorporate Comments to Proposed Order Recognizing Foreign Proceeding Filed by Debtor Deelish Brands Pte. Ltd. (In Creditors' Voluntary Liquidation) (Fineman, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
10 10 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Fri 05/17 9:53 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Weiss, Sharon. (Weiss, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 05/16 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/16/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Hearing (BK Case) Tue 05/14 1:44 PM
Notice of Hearing , Notice of Filing of Petition under Chapter 15 and Order Scheduling Hearing Filed by Debtor Deelish Brands Pte. Ltd. (In Creditors' Voluntary Liquidation) Related [+]. (Fineman, Kimberly)
Related: [-] 3 Application - Foreign Representative's Application for Recognition of Foreign Main Proceeding and Certain Related Relief Filed by Debtor Deelish Brands Pte. Ltd. (In Creditors' Voluntary Liquidation) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Att: 1 Proof of Service
7 7 court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Tue 05/14 10:42 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 6/13/2024 at 11:30 AM at Crtrm 1639, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Deborah J. Saltzman. Due to the COVID-19 public health emergency, the courtroom will be closed to the public and the hearing will be held via ZoomGov, which provides both audio and video access. All parties and members of the public may connect to the hearing free of charge. ZoomGov connection information for this hearing will be posted on the Court's public calendar for Judge Saltzman, accessible on the court's website: http://ecf-ciao.cacb.uscourts.gov/CiaoPosted/default.aspx. (MB2)
Related: [-] 5 Ex parte application filed by Debtor Deelish Brands Pte. Ltd. (In Creditors' Voluntary Liquidation)
6 6 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Tue 05/14 10:33 AM
Order granting ex parte motion for order scheduling hearing on chapter 15 petition and specifying form and manner of notice. Refer to order for details. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 5/14/2024 (MB2)
Related: [-] 5
Thursday, May 09, 2024
5 5 motion Ex parte application (motion) Thu 05/09 11:51 AM
Ex parte application for Order Scheduling Hearing on Chapter 15 Petition and Specifying Form and Manner of Service Filed by Debtor Deelish Brands Pte. Ltd. (In Creditors' Voluntary Liquidation) (Fineman, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex A - Proposed Order
Att: 2 Ex B - Proposed Notice
Att: 3 Proof of Service
4 4 misc Declaration Thu 05/09 10:59 AM
Declaration re: Chan Li Shan in Support of Foreign Representative's Application for Recognition of Foreign Main Proceeding and Certain Related Relief Filed by Debtor Deelish Brands Pte. Ltd. (In Creditors' Voluntary Liquidation) Related [+]. (Fineman, Kimberly)
Related: [-] 3 Application - Foreign Representative's Application for Recognition of Foreign Main Proceeding and Certain Related Relief
3 3 motion X - Application (Generic) (motion) Thu 05/09 10:45 AM
Application - Foreign Representative's Application for Recognition of Foreign Main Proceeding and Certain Related Relief Filed by Debtor Deelish Brands Pte. Ltd. (In Creditors' Voluntary Liquidation) (Fineman, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 misc Chapter 15 List Thu 05/09 10:27 AM
Chapter 15 List and Statements Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Section 1515(c), Bankruptcy Rules 1007(a)(40 and 7007.1, and Local Bankruptcy Rule 1007-4 Filed by Debtor Deelish Brands Pte. Ltd. (In Creditors' Voluntary Liquidation). (Fineman, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs misc Chapter 15 Petition for Recognition of a Foreign Proceeding (Official Form 401) Thu 05/09 9:54 AM
Chapter 15 Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding (Official Form 401). Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Deelish Brands Pte. Ltd. (In Creditors' Voluntary Liquidation) (Fineman, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Attachments for Item 6
Att: 2 Attachment for Item 11
court U - Assigned Judge to a case (Manual) Thu 05/09 12:01 PM
Judge Deborah J. Saltzman added to case (JA)
Related: [-]