Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-10711

Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David E Rice
Case #: 1:24-ap-00109
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:May 08, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Charlotte L. Aufdem-Brinke
PO Box 2995
Annapolis, MD 21404
Represented By
Charlotte L. Aufdem-Brinke
contact info
Plaintiff
Neal Glessner
8707 Mapleville Road
Boonsboro, MD 21713
Represented By
Adam Greivell
Greivell & Garrott Johnson, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Saturday, December 21, 2024
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Auto-Docket) Sun 12/22 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order (Generic)
Thursday, December 19, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 12/19 9:32 AM
Consent Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Pending Resolution of Non-Bankruptcy Litigation Related [+]. (Hutchinson, Janine)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Neal Glessner
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
20 20 apmisc Line Tue 12/17 4:04 PM
Line - submitting: Consent Order to Stay Adversary Proceeding Filed by Joseph Michael Selba. (Selba, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Consent Order Staying Adversary Proceeding Pending Resolution of Non-Bankruptcy Litigation
court Disposition Without Hearing - CDP (Auto-Docket) Tue 12/17 8:17 AM
Disposition Without Hearing: re:1 Complaint - PARTIES WILL SUBMIT CONSENT ORDER STAYING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING PENDING OUTCOME OF STATE COURT LITIGATION. Related [+] (Scott, Cherita)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,17 Answer to Complaint
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
court Disposition Without Hearing - CDP (Auto-Docket) Tue 11/12 10:10 AM
Disposition Without Hearing: re:1 Complaint, re:17 Answer to Complaint - ALL MATTERS ARE CONTINUED TO 12/17/2024 02:00 PM BY VIDEO CONFERENCE. Related [+] (Scott, Cherita)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,17 Answer to Complaint
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
court Disposition Without Hearing - CDP (Auto-Docket) Wed 09/25 1:43 PM
Pretrial Conference Held by Video Conference: re:1 Complaint, re:17 Answer to Complaint - ALL MATTERS ARE CONTINUED TO 11/12/2024 10:00 AM BY VIDEOCONFERENCE. Related [+] (Taylor, Shanita)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,17 Answer to Complaint
Friday, September 13, 2024
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Auto-Docket) Sat 09/14 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/13/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
18 18 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 09/11 7:54 AM
Order Denying Debtor's Motion to Dismiss Complaint Related [+]. (Hutchinson, Janine)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Charlotte L. Aufdem-Brinke
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/10 10:02 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Charlotte L. Aufdem-Brinke. (Selba, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
court Disposition Without Hearing - CDP (Auto-Docket) Wed 08/28 11:28 AM
Evidentiary Hearing Held: re:1 Complaint IS CONTINUED TO 09/25/2024 10:00 AM BY VIDEO CONFERENCE; re:7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding IS DENIED. Order to be prepared by Respondent. Related [+] (Scott, Cherita)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding,8 Opposition
Friday, August 02, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Auto-Docket) Sat 08/03 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
15 15 order Continue Hearing Wed 07/31 9:39 AM
Order Rescheduling Hearing and Pretrial Conference Related [+]. The hearing described below shall be continued to August 28, 2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9-D, Baltimore - Judge Rice (Hutchinson, Janine)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Neal Glessner,7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Charlotte L. Aufdem-Brinke,8 Opposition filed by Plaintiff Neal Glessner
Thursday, July 18, 2024
14 14 motion Continue Hearing Thu 07/18 2:29 PM
Consent Motion to Continue Hearing Scheduled for August 7, 2024 Filed by Charlotte L. Aufdem-Brinke Related [+]. (Selba, Joseph)
Related: [-] 10 Notice of Hearing,11 Notice of Pretrial Conference
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP Hearing (Auto-Docket) Thu 07/18 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Notice of Pretrial Conference
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP Hearing (Auto-Docket) Thu 07/18 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Notice of Hearing
Monday, July 15, 2024
11 11 court Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 07/15 1:59 PM
Notice of Continued Pretrial Conference Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/7/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9-D, Baltimore- Judge Rice. (Scott, Cherita)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Neal Glessner
10 10 court Notice of Hearing Mon 07/15 1:57 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 8/7/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9-D, Baltimore - Judge Rice. (Scott, Cherita)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Charlotte L. Aufdem-Brinke,8 Opposition filed by Plaintiff Neal Glessner
Monday, July 08, 2024
9 9 cmp Affidavit of Summons Service Mon 07/08 8:43 AM
Affidavit of Summons Service Executed on Charlotte L. Aufdem-Brinke 6/18/2024 . (Greivell, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Mailing Receipt
8 8 answer Opposition Mon 07/08 8:06 AM
Opposition on behalf of Neal Glessner Filed by Adam Greivell Related [+]. (Greivell, Adam)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Charlotte L. Aufdem-Brinke
Att: 1 Exhibit eFiling Registration Emails (2015)
Att: 2 Exhibit eFiling Confirmation (2015)
Thursday, June 20, 2024
7 7 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 06/20 11:14 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Charlotte L. Aufdem-Brinke. (Selba, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 14, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP (Auto-Docket) Sat 06/15 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Summons Issued
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
5 5 court Summons Issued Wed 06/12 10:20 AM
Summons Re-Issued on Charlotte L. Aufdem-Brinke Date Issued 6/12/2024, Answer Due 7/12/2024 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/1/2024 at 10:00 AM by videoconference or teleconference. Contact Hearings_DER@mdb.uscourts.gov for instructions on how to participate in the hearing. (Scott, Cherita)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Neal Glessner
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Unexecuted Tue 06/11 5:23 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted Re: Charlotte L. Aufdem-Brinke (Greivell, Adam)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 11, 2024
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP (Auto-Docket) Sun 05/12 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, May 09, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 05/09 11:45 AM
Summons Issued on Charlotte L. Aufdem-Brinke Date Issued 5/9/2024, Answer Due 6/10/2024 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/2/2024 at 10:00 AM by videoconference or teleconference. Contact Hearings_DER@mdb.uscourts.gov for instructions on how to participate in the hearing. (Scott, Cherita)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Neal Glessner
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (Case Opening) Wed 05/08 1:54 PM
Adversary case 24-00109 (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) Complaint by Adam Greivell on behalf of Neal Glessner against Charlotte L. Aufdem-Brinke. Fee Amount $350. (Greivell, Adam) Modified on 5/9/2024. Modified description of attachment. (Arter, Laurie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Fourth Amended Complaint from Pending State Court Action