Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Christy Criswell Wiegand
Case #: 2:24-cv-00697
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Case Filed:May 09, 2024
Re-opened:Apr 16, 2025
Terminated:Aug 16, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 05, 2024 3:43 AM EST
Cross Claimant
DENISE CAROLINE GARGASZ-MUELLER
Represented By
Stanley M Stein
Stanley M. Stein, P.C.
contact info
Cross Claimant
WALTER MILTON YOST, II
Represented By
Peter S. Wolff
Pietragallo Gordon Alfano Bosick & Raspanti, LLP
contact info
Jesse Marra
Pietragallo Gordon Alfano Bosick & Raspanti, LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
DENISE CAROLINE GARGASZ-MUELLER
Represented By
Stanley M Stein
Stanley M. Stein, P.C.
contact info
Cross Defendant
WALTER MILTON YOST, II
Represented By
Peter S. Wolff
Pietragallo Gordon Alfano Bosick & Raspanti, LLP
contact info
Jesse Marra
Pietragallo Gordon Alfano Bosick & Raspanti, LLP
contact info
Defendant
DENISE CAROLINE GARGASZ-MUELLER
Represented By
Stanley M Stein
Stanley M. Stein, P.C.
contact info
Stanley M. Stein
Stanley M. Stein, PC
contact info
John J Truitt
Vernon Litigation Group
contact info
Defendant
WALTER MILTON YOST, II
Represented By
Peter S. Wolff
Pietragallo Gordon Alfano Bosick & Raspanti, LLP
contact info
Jesse Marra
Pietragallo Gordon Alfano Bosick & Raspanti, LLP
contact info
Mediator
Mark D. Shepard
Babst Calland 603 Stanwix St, 6th Fl Two Gateway Center
Pittsburgh, PA 15222
Represented By
Mark D. Shepard
Babst, Calland, Clements & Zomnir
contact info
Plaintiff
ALLEGHENY PLASTICS, INC.
Represented By
Lucy E. Hill
contact info
Lucy Hill
Dentons Cohen & Grigsby P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 84 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
60 60 order Initial Local Rule 16.1 Scheduling Order Wed 04/30 9:05 PM
ORDER Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference:Initial Case Management set for 5/29/2025 at 09:30 AM via telephone before Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 5/15/2025. Rule 26 Meeting Report and ADR Stipulation due by 5/22/2025. Position papers due 5/23/2025. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 4/30/2025. (drc)
Related: [-]
59 59 answer Answer to Crossclaim Wed 04/30 9:19 AM
ANSWER to33 Answer to Complaint,,,, Crossclaim,,, by DENISE CAROLINE GARGASZ-MUELLER. (Stein, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit