Alaska District Court
Judge:Sharon L Gleason
Case #: 3:24-cv-00104
Nature of Suit130 Contract - Miller Act
Cause40:270 Miller Act
Case Filed:May 09, 2024
Case in other court:Indiana Northern, 3:22-cv-00847
Last checked: Monday Nov 04, 2024 11:27 PM AKST
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Anne Marie Tavella
Davis Wright Tremaine Llp (anch)
contact info
Anne M Tavella PHV
Davis Wright Tremaine Llp - Anc/ak
contact info
Andrew W Hull
Hoover Hull Turner LLP
contact info
Riley H Floyd
Hoover Hull Turner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rockford Corporation
Represented By
Anne Marie Tavella
Davis Wright Tremaine Llp (anch)
contact info
Anne M Tavella PHV
Davis Wright Tremaine Llp - Anc/ak
contact info
Andrew W Hull
Hoover Hull Turner LLP
contact info
Riley H Floyd
Hoover Hull Turner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
HIS Constructors, Inc.
5150 East 65the Street, Suite B
Indianapolis, IN 46220
Represented By
Thomas Pastore
Thomas Pastore PC
contact info
Adam W. Cook
Birch Horton Bittner & Cherot
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Thomas Pastore
Thomas Pastore PC
contact info
Adam W. Cook
Birch Horton Bittner & Cherot
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM AKDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
41 41 trial Witness List Fri 05/09 12:31 PM
Witness List by HIS Constructors, Inc., United States of America. (Cook, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
40 40 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 03/10 7:58 AM
ORDER granting39 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. See order for details. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 3/10/2025. (SCD, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
39 39 motion Amend/Correct Wed 03/05 10:23 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct37 Scheduling Order by Rockford Corporation.(Tavella, Anne Marie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 11, 2024
38 38 order Order on Motion to Withdraw Fri 10/11 2:10 PM
SLG TEXT ORDER : The Motion for Leave of Court to Withdraw Appearance at Docket36 is GRANTED. Thomas Pastore may withdraw pursuant to Local Civil Rule 11.1(c)(1)(B) as Adam Cook has entered a substitute appearance on behalf of HIS Constructors at Docket 34. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
37 37 order Scheduling Order Mon 10/07 2:08 PM
SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/4/2025 . Dispositive Motions due by 10/29/2025 . See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/7/2024. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
36 36 motion Withdraw Fri 10/04 11:00 AM
MOTION to Withdraw Appearance on behalf of by HIS Constructors, Inc..(Pastore, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
35 35 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 10/01 3:05 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cook, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
34 34 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/26 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam W. Cook on behalf of HIS Constructors, Inc., United States of America (Cook, Adam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
33 33 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 09/11 4:36 PM
SLG TEXT ORDER : The Motion for Enlargement of Time to Submit Rule 26 Meeting Report at Docket32 is GRANTED. The deadline for the Rule 26 Meeting Report is extended to October 1, 2024 . (SCD, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 09/06 7:57 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26 Meeting Report by HIS Constructors, Inc..(Pastore, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
31 31 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/16 3:05 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by All Defendants.(Tavella, Anne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
30 30 notice Clerks Notice - Declination of Consent Submitted Tue 08/13 4:34 PM
AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE : A Declination of Consent as was timely submitted. This case will remain assigned to District Judge Sharon L. Gleason. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
29 29 notice Clerks Notice - No Declination of Consent Submitted Fri 08/09 1:47 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: No Declination of Consent has been timely submitted. Therefore, this case is REASSIGNED to Chief Magistrate Judge Matthew M. Scoble, who will continue to exercise full civil jurisdiction over the entire case for all purposes. (SCD, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
28 28 order Order to Answer Mon 08/05 9:57 AM
SLG TEXT ORDER : Defendants in this matter shall file their answers within 14 days of the date of this order. (SCD, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Initial Case Status Report Order Mon 08/05 9:42 AM
ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 8/5/2024. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
26 26 2 pgs order Order Tue 07/23 10:08 AM
ORDER RE INTENT TO REASSIGN TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM . Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 7/23/2024. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
25 25 order Order Reassigning Case Tue 07/09 3:06 PM
SLG TEXT ORDER : In light of the resignation of Judge Kindred this case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Sharon L. Gleason for all future proceedings. Please use case number 3:24-cv-00104-SLG on all future filings. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
24 24 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 06/13 11:17 AM
JMK TEXT ORDER : The Motions to Withdraw at Dockets22 and23 are GRANTED. The Clerk shall remove Andrew Hull and Riley Floyd from the service list. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 06/13 4:46 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Rockford Corporation.(Hull, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
22 22 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 06/13 4:39 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Rockford Corporation.(Floyd, Riley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 09, 2024
21 21 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 05/09 8:33 AM
Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:22-cv-00847. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
20 20 11 pgs OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTING15 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Rockford Corporation. This case is TRANSFERRED to the District of Alaska. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 4/19/23. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
19 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re16 MOTION to Change Venue ,15 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Rockford Corporation. (Tavella PHV, Anne) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
18 18 BRIEF in Opposition to16 MOTION to Change Venue ,15 MOTION to Change Venue filed by HIS Constructors, Inc.. (Pastore, Thomas) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
17 17 ORDER GRANTING14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Rockford Corporation. The Court will enter an order setting the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint following resolution of the Defendants' Motion to Change Venue, which remains pending before this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 11/22/22. (ksp) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
16 16 Brief in Support of15 MOTION to Change Venue by Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Rockford Corporation. (Tavella PHV, Anne) Modified on 11/21/2022 to term as a motion and edit docket text (nae). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
15 15 MOTION to Change Venue by Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Rockford Corporation. (Tavella PHV, Anne) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
14 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Rockford Corporation. (Tavella PHV, Anne) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
13 13 ORDER granting12 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Anne M Tavella PHV for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Rockford Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 11/14/2022. (ace) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
12 12 Application for Attorney Anne Marie Tavella to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Rockford Corporation and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5073643(Tavella, Anne) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
Set Deadline: Defendants, Rockford Corporation and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company Answer due 11/30/2022 per9 Notice of Automatic Initial Extension of Time. (jdb) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
11 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.. (Hull, Andrew) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
10 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockford Corporation identifying Corporate Parent UIC Commercial Services, LLC, Corporate Parent Ukpeagvik Inupiat Corporation for Rockford Corporation.. (Hull, Andrew) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE of (Automatic Initial Extension of Time) by Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Rockford Corporation. (Hull, Andrew) Modified on 10/31/2022 (kmt). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Riley H Floyd on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Rockford Corporation (Floyd, Riley) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W Hull on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Rockford Corporation (Hull, Andrew) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2022
6 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Liberty Mutual on 10/12/2022, filed by HIS Constructors, Inc.. (Pastore, Thomas) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
5 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Rockford Corporation on 10/12/2022, filed by HIS Constructors, Inc.. (Pastore, Thomas) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
4 4 Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Rockford Corporation. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mrm) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
3 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HIS Constructors, Inc.. (Pastore, Thomas) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons filed by HIS Constructors, Inc.. (Pastore, Thomas) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by HIS Constructors, Inc..(Pastore, Thomas) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/9/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Bid,
Att: 2 Exhibit Contract,
Att: 3 Exhibit Correspondence
Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. **NEW CASE** (mrm) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 5/9/2024.]
Related: [-]