Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Patrick R Wyrick
Case #: 5:24-cv-00472
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:May 09, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 05, 2024 2:34 AM CST
Defendant
Encompass Insurance Company of America
Represented By
Jasper V Abbott
Dewberry Hubbard
contact info
Naureen Hubbard
Sweet Dewberry Hubbard - Okc
contact info
Plaintiff
Meghann Tilford
Represented By
Michael D McGrew
Mcgrew Mcgrew & Associates
contact info
Kristen M Merritt
Mcgrew, Mcgrew & Associates
contact info
Matthew M McGrew
Mcgrew Mcgrew & Associates
contact info
Robin D McGrew
Mcgrew Mcgrew & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Shaun Tilford
Represented By
Michael D McGrew
Mcgrew Mcgrew & Associates
contact info
Kristen M Merritt
Mcgrew, Mcgrew & Associates
contact info
Matthew M McGrew
Mcgrew Mcgrew & Associates
contact info
Robin D McGrew
Mcgrew Mcgrew & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 03/25 3:11 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kristen M Merritt terminated. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 3/25/2025. (ekw)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
17 17 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 02/10 4:12 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney KRISTEN MERRITT by All Plaintiffs. (McGrew, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings Thu 01/23 2:57 PM
ORDER granting15 the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines, striking the case from the Court's April 2025 Trial Docket, and resetting the case on the Court's August 2025 Trial Docket (as more fully set out in the order). Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 1/23/2025. (ekw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
15 15 motion Extend Deadlines or Hearings Wed 01/22 11:49 AM
JOINT MOTION to Extend Deadlines or Hearings by All Plaintiffs. (McGrew, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order Fri 09/06 8:52 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set on the April 2025 trial docket (4/8/2025 09:00 AM) in Courtroom 503 before Judge Patrick R Wyrick (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 9/6/2024. (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
13 13 misc Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan Wed 09/04 2:49 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiffs Shaun Tilford, Meghann Tilford. (McGrew, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Mon 08/26 11:03 AM
ENTER ORDER - The Status and Scheduling Conference scheduled for September 11, 2024 is hereby STRICKEN. A Scheduling Order will be entered based on the Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan filed by counsel. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 8/26/2024. (ks)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
11 11 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 07/15 11:20 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jasper V Abbott on behalf of Encompass Insurance Company of America (Abbott, Jasper)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
10 10 misc Docket Tue 07/09 8:52 AM
SEPTEMBER STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2024 10:50 AM in Chambers before Judge Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 9/4/2024. (ks)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
9 9 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 06/17 1:33 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Robin D McGrew on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McGrew, Robin)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 06/17 1:32 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Kristen M Merritt on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Merritt, Kristen)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 06/17 1:31 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew M McGrew on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McGrew, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 06/17 1:29 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Michael D McGrew on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McGrew, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Mon 06/10 11:04 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Encompass Insurance Company of America . (Hubbard, Naureen)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer Mon 06/10 11:03 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Encompass Insurance Company of America.(Hubbard, Naureen)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 06/10 11:01 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Naureen Hubbard on behalf of Encompass Insurance Company of America (Hubbard, Naureen)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
misc Payment for a Civil Case Fri 05/10 1:09 PM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4430308. (McGrew, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 05/09 4:02 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Encompass Insurance Company of America. (dtb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/09 4:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Encompass Insurance Company of America filed by Shaun Tilford, Meghann Tilford.(dtb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet 28:1332