Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:J Randal Hall
Referred: Brian K Epps
Case #: 6:24-cv-00022
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:May 08, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 04, 2024 3:40 AM EST
Defendant
Cavalier Home Builders, LLC
Represented By
Heather H. Miller
Mcgrew Miller Bomar & Bagley LLC
contact info
Spenser Templeton
Simpson, Mcmahan, Glick & Burford, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Todd Padgett Housing Center, Inc.
Represented By
William Elmore Callaway, Jr.
Callaway, Neville & Brinson
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew Doyle Parker
Represented By
Graham F. Floyd
Johnson Floyd LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Erin Faith Parker
Represented By
Graham F. Floyd
Johnson Floyd LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Platinum Home Mortgage Corporation
Terminated: 10/22/2024
Represented By
Andrew John Lavoie
Bruce, Mathews & Lavoie
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
32 32 misc Status Report Mon 04/14 2:22 PM
STATUS REPORT Jointly Submitted by all Parties by Andrew Doyle Parker, Erin Faith Parker. (Floyd, Graham)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
31 31 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 04/03 10:03 AM
ORDER directing parties to file a joint status report within 14 days of the date of this Order. Status Report due by 4/17/2025. Signed by District Judge J. Randal Hall on 4/3/2025. (maa)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave of Absence Fri 01/31 9:11 AM
ORDER granting29 Motion for Leave of Absence for Attorney Graham Floyd for the following dates: February 13, 2025, February 18, 2025, March 6-7, 2025, March 13, 2025, March 24, 2025, April 10, 2025, April 28, 2025, May 8, 2025, May 17-30, 2025, June 12, 2025, June 23, 2025, July 1-7, 2025, July 10, 2025, July 25 - August 3, 2025, August 14, 2025, July 28, 2025, August 25, 2025, September 11, 2025, September 22, 2025, October 9, 2025, October 20, 2025, November 13, 2025, November 24, 2025, December 11, 2025, and December 22, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 01/31/2025. Modified on 1/31/2025 (jlh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
29 29 motion Leave of Absence Thu 01/30 2:46 PM
MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Andrew Doyle Parker, Erin Faith Parker for dates of : January 21 & 27, February 13 & 18, March 6-7, 13 & 24, April 10 & 28, May 8 & 17-30, June 12 & 23, July 1-7, 10 and 25-31, August 1-3, 14 & 25, September 11 & 22, October 9 & 20, November 13 & 24 and December 11 & 22, 2025 by Andrew Doyle Parker, Erin Faith Parker. Responses due by 2/13/2025.(Floyd, Graham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Motion for Leave of Absence
utility Motions Referred Thu 01/30 4:34 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:29 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Andrew Doyle Parker, Erin Faith Parker for dates of: January 21 & 27, February 13 & 18, March 6-7, 13 & 24, April 10 & 28, May 8 & 17-30, June 12 & 23, July 1-7, 10 and 25-31, August 1-3, 14 & 25, September 11 & 22, October 9 & 20, November 13 & 24 and December 11 & 22, 2025. (csr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
27 27 15 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Compel Arbitration Order on Motion to Stay Tue 10/22 9:10 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiffs' motion to amend complaint (Doc.16 ); granting Defendant Cavalier's motion to compel arbitration and stay action (Doc.18 ); denying Defendant Platinum's motion to dismiss (Doc.9 ). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that (1) Plaintiffs and Defendants SHALL ARBITRATE their claims; and (2) the entire case is STAYED pending arbitration. Plaintiffs and Defendants SHALL file a joint status report with the Court every ONE HUNDRED AND TWENTY (120) DAYS until the arbitration has concluded. Defendant Platinum is terminated as a party to this action. Signed by District Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/21/2024. (amd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
26 26 respoth Response Thu 08/29 4:18 PM
RESPONSE to24 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Andrew Doyle Parker, Erin Faith Parker filed by Cavalier Home Builders, LLC. (Miller, Heather)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Intent Wed 08/21 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Intent by Cavalier Home Builders, LLC. (Miller, Heather)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
24 24 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 08/15 4:13 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay all Proceedings filed by Andrew Doyle Parker, Erin Faith Parker. (Floyd, Graham)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 07/29 10:59 AM
ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and MOTION to Stay. Responses due by 8/15/2024. Signed by District Judge J. Randal Hall on 7/29/24. (wwp)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 07/29 9:25 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay by Andrew Doyle Parker, Erin Faith Parker. Responses due by 8/12/2024.(Floyd, Graham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Second Consent Motion
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/29 11:00 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay . Responses due by 8/15/2024. (wwp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 07/09 4:40 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay all proceedings. The deadline to respond is extended through and including July 30, 2024. Signed by District Judge J. Randal Hall on 7/9/2024. (kjm)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 07/09 4:43 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay. Responses due by 7/30/2024. (kjm)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
20 20 respm Response to Motion Fri 07/05 4:17 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay filed by Platinum Home Mortgage Corporation. (Lavoie, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 07/02 1:49 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay by Andrew Doyle Parker, Erin Faith Parker. Responses due by 7/16/2024.(Floyd, Graham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Oder
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
18 18 motion Compel Arbitration Stay Wed 06/26 5:13 PM
******* MOTION to Compel Arbitration , MOTION to Stay by Cavalier Home Builders, LLC. Responses due by 7/10/2024.(Miller, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration/Affidavit of Chann Woodard
Monday, June 24, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Mon 06/24 11:14 AM
ORDER directing the parties to conduct a conference within fourteen days of the date of this Order and to file a joint 26(f) Report within seven days of the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/24/2024. (Attachment: #1 Rule 26(f) Report Form.) (jlh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
16 16 motion Amend/Correct Thu 06/20 11:50 AM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Andrew Doyle Parker, Erin Faith Parker. Responses due by 7/5/2024.(Floyd, Graham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order Pursuant to F.R.C.P 15(a)(2)
utility Motions Referred Thu 06/20 12:36 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:16 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. (csr)
Related: [-]
utility Motions No Longer Referred Thu 06/20 2:37 PM
Motions No Longer Referred:16 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (cmr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/04 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Elmore Callaway, Jr on behalf of Todd Padgett Housing Center, Inc. (Callaway, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Wed 05/29 3:41 PM
ORDER directing defense counsel, William E. Callaway, Jr., to file a notice of appearance or a notice identifying any substitute counsel by no later than Wednesday, June 5, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 5/29/2024. (maa)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/29 9:40 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to9 MOTION to Dismiss. 9 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 6/21/2024. Signed by District Judge J. Randal Hall on 5/29/2024. (pts)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 05/29 3:42 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 6/5/2024. (maa)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 05/24 10:02 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to9 MOTION to Dismiss by Andrew Doyle Parker, Erin Faith Parker. Responses due by 6/7/2024.(Floyd, Graham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Motions Referred Fri 05/24 10:30 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to9 MOTION to Dismiss (thb)
Related: [-]
utility Motions No Longer Referred Fri 05/24 2:57 PM
Motions No Longer Referred:12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to9 MOTION to Dismiss (cmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) Thu 05/16 10:50 AM
AMENDED Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by Platinum Home Mortgage Corporation. Amendment to10 . (Lavoie, Andrew) Modified on 5/16/2024 (csr)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) Thu 05/16 7:54 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by Platinum Home Mortgage Corporation. (Lavoie, Andrew)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss Thu 05/16 7:54 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Platinum Home Mortgage Corporation. Responses due by 5/30/2024. (Lavoie, Andrew)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/16 7:53 AM
Verified Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by Platinum Home Mortgage Corporation.(Lavoie, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Tue 05/14 9:05 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 5/14/2024. (maa)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/13 12:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number BGASDC-3822620, Fee Amount $200, by Cavalier Home Builders, LLC. Responses due by 5/28/2024.(Miller, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
utility Motions Referred Mon 05/13 2:22 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number BGASDC-3822620, Fee Amount $200. (pts)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
5 5 order Rule 26(f) Order Thu 05/09 4:08 PM
RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 5/9/2024. (gmh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 05/09 4:07 PM
REMOVAL NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re1 Notice of Removal. Platinum Home Mortgage Corporation Answer due 5/16/2024.Notices of Appearance/Motions to appear Pro Hac Vice due by 5/19/2024. Previously-filed state court Motions due by 5/23/2024. (gmh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/09 3:51 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cavalier Home Builders, LLC, identifying Cavalier Homes, Inc., and Berkshire Hathaway Inc., as Corporate Parent. (gmh)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Filing Thu 05/09 3:48 PM
NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. § 1446(d) with Notice of Filing Notice of Removal by Cavalier Home Builders, LLC. (gmh)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 05/09 3:44 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cavalier Home Builders, LLC from Superior Court of Evans County, case number SUV2024000009. (Filing fee paid, $405.00, Receipt # BGASDC-3820224.) (gmh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Court File: Civil Case Filing Form; Complaint; Summonses; Verification of Andrew Parker; Sheriff's Entry of Service (Todd Padgett Housing); Answer of Defendant Todd Padgett Housing Center, Inc.; Sheriff's Entry of Service (Cavalier Home Builders, LLC); Answer of Cavalier Home Builders, LLC; Sheriff's Entry of Service (Platinum Home Mortgage Corp.); Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant Platinum Home Mortgage to Answer; Civil Case Filing form,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Demand Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Platinum Consent to Remove,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Padgett Consent to Remove,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet