South Carolina District Court
Judge:Joseph Dawson, III
Case #: 4:24-cv-02885
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 08, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 04, 2024 4:09 AM EST
Defendant
RPE Contracting, Inc
Defendant
Michael Scott Rivers
Defendant
Randy J Rivers
Represented By
Benjamin Clement Bruner
Bruner Powell Wall And Mullins LLC
contact info
Henry P Wall
Bruner Powell Wall And Mullins LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ameris Bank
Represented By
David A Garland
Moore Clarke Duvall And Rodgers PC
contact info
Wheeler Hamilton Bryant
Moore Clarke Duvall And Rodgers (ga)
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, February 13, 2025
41 41 motion Default Judgment Thu 02/13 9:06 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Michael Scott Rivers by Ameris Bank. Response to Motion due by 2/27/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bryant, Wheeler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit to Motion for Default Judgment Against Michael Scott Rivers,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Default Judgment Against Michael Scott Rivers
Thursday, January 30, 2025
39 39 order Order Staying Case Thu 01/30 9:28 AM
TEXT ORDER STAYING CASE: It is ordered that the proceedings in the captioned action be stayed, pending conclusion of the proceedings in the United States Bankruptcy Court. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 1/30/2025. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
38 38 misc Suggestion of Bankruptcy Mon 01/27 5:06 PM
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to RPE Contracting, Inc. by Ameris Bank.(Bryant, Wheeler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Bankruptcy
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
37 37 motion Joinder Wed 01/08 4:50 PM
Consent MOTION for Joinder / Drop Randy J. Rivers as a Defendant and to Drop Ameris Bank as a Counterclaim Defendant Pursuant to Rule 21 by Ameris Bank. Response to Motion due by 1/22/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bryant, Wheeler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order
Monday, November 04, 2024
36 36 order Scheduling Order Mon 11/04 3:34 PM
SECOND AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/2/2025, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/3/2025, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/3/2025, Discovery due by 4/14/2025, Motions due by 6/5/2025, Jury Selection Deadline 9/1/2025, Mediation Due by 5/14/2025. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 11/4/2024. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
35 35 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 11/04 3:27 PM
TEXT ORDER granting unopposed 29 Motion to Extend Deadlines as provided in the Second Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 11/4/2024. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
33 33 misc Entry Deletion Thu 10/10 10:21 AM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 32 Reason: filed prematurely by filer. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
32 32 motion Compel Thu 10/03 6:06 PM
First MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery Requests by Ameris Bank. Response to Motion due by 10/17/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Bryant, Wheeler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibits to Motion to Compel,
Att: 2 Memo in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Compel,
Att: 3 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Faith Compliance
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/03 5:16 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re28 MOTION for Protective Order Response filed by Randy J Rivers.(Bruner, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter of Resignation,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Action of Shareholders,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Exceprt of Email from Scott Rivers to David White,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Ltr to Pl. Counsel with encl.
Thursday, September 26, 2024
30 30 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 09/26 5:22 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re28 MOTION for Protective Order Response filed by Ameris Bank.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/3/2024 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Bryant, Wheeler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Protective Order
Monday, September 23, 2024
29 29 motion Extension of Time Mon 09/23 5:12 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Make Expert Disclosure by Ameris Bank. Response to Motion due by 10/7/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Bryant, Wheeler)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
28 28 motion Protective Order Thu 09/12 4:14 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by Randy J Rivers. Response to Motion due by 9/26/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Bruner, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - 2024.08.13 - Discovery Request Served,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - 2024.08.14 - Discovery Request Served
Monday, September 09, 2024
27 27 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/09 5:13 PM
Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint /Counterclaim of Defendant Randy Rivers by Ameris Bank.(Bryant, Wheeler)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 09/09 9:56 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to RPE Contracting, Inc and Michael Scott Rivers. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
25 25 misc Request for Entry of Default Tue 09/03 5:08 PM
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT byAmeris Bank.(Bryant, Wheeler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Request for Entry of Default Against RPE Contracting, Inc. and Michael Scott Rivers
23 23 misc Entry Deletion Tue 09/03 3:05 PM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 22 Reason: filed in error by filer. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
22 22 motion Default Judgment Mon 08/26 2:27 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to RPE Contracting, Inc. and Michael Scott Rivers by Ameris Bank. Response to Motion due by 9/9/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bryant, Wheeler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Against RPE Contracting, Inc. and Michael Scott Rivers,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
21 21 order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 08/26 11:17 AM
TEXT ORDER granting consent 20 Motion for Leave to Amend Answer. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 8/26/2024. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
20 20 motion Amend/Correct Wed 08/21 4:59 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct10 Answer to Complaint by Randy J Rivers. Response to Motion due by 9/4/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Bruner, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Pleading,
Att: 2 Exhibit Consent from Plaintiff's Counsel
Thursday, August 01, 2024
19 19 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 08/01 2:58 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Ameris Bank.(Bryant, Wheeler)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
18 18 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 07/31 7:20 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Randy J Rivers.(Bruner, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Tue 07/30 11:11 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameris Bank. Proof of Service Michael Scott Rivers served on 7/17/2024, answer due 8/7/2024. (Bryant, Wheeler)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Tue 07/30 11:10 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameris Bank. Proof of Service RPE Contracting, Inc served on 7/17/2024, answer due 8/7/2024. (Bryant, Wheeler)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
15 15 order Scheduling Order Wed 07/17 3:36 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/31/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 7/31/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/21/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/23/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/23/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/23/2024, Discovery due by 1/2/2025, Motions due by 2/22/2025, Jury Selection Deadline 5/22/2025, Mediation Due by 2/2/2025. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 7/17/2024. (hcic, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
14 14 discov Rule 26(f) Report Tue 07/09 6:09 PM
First Rule 26(f) Report by Ameris Bank.(Bryant, Wheeler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Amended Scheduling Order Via Stipulation of Parties
Thursday, June 06, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Order Thu 06/06 12:02 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/27/2024, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/11/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 7/11/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/1/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/3/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/3/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/3/2024, Discovery due by 12/2/2024, Motions due by 1/2/2025, Jury Selection Deadline 4/2/2025, Mediation Due by 12/2/2024. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 6/6/2024. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
11 11 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 06/05 4:15 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Randy J Rivers.(Wall, Henry)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/05 3:55 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, by Randy J Rivers.(Wall, Henry)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/05 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Henry P Wall on behalf of Randy J Rivers (Wall, Henry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Wed 05/29 11:50 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted Related [+] by Ameris Bank as to Michael Scott Rivers. (Bryant, Wheeler)
Related: [-] stricted Access
Thursday, May 23, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Thu 05/23 2:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameris Bank. Randy J Rivers served on 5/17/2024, answer due 6/7/2024. (Bryant, Wheeler)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
6 6 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/14 3:22 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 5 Motion in Support of Pro Hac Vice Application for David Allen Garland. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 5/14/2024. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion) Mon 05/13 12:23 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David A. Garland ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11760209) by Ameris Bank. Response to Motion due by 5/28/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Bryant, Wheeler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Motion in Support of Pro Hac Vice Application
Thursday, May 09, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 05/09 12:21 PM
Summons Issued as to RPE Contracting, Inc, Michael Scott Rivers, Randy J Rivers. Service due by 8/7/2024. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 05/09 12:11 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ameris Bank. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/09 12:09 PM
COMPLAINT against RPE Contracting, Inc, Michael Scott Rivers, Randy J Rivers (filing fee $ 405 receipt number BSCDC-11751421), filed by Ameris Bank. Service due by 8/6/2024. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Master Lease Agreement and Lease Schedule No. 257604-001,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Commencement Agreement Lease # 257604-001,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 Change Addendum Lease Agreement 257604-001,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 UCC Financing Statement Number 210423-1809185,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 Master Lease Agreement and Lease Schedule No. 257604-002,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 Addendum to Master Lease # 257604-002,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 Addendum I UCC 2A Supplier(s) Disclosure,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 Change Addendum Lease Agreement 257604-002,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 UCC Financing Statement Number 220201-1540026,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 Master Lease Agreement and Lease Schedule No. 442144-000,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 Addendum I UCC 2A Supplier(s) Disclosure,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 Change Addendum Lease Agreement 442144-000,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 UCC Financing Statement Number 230306-2004151,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 Continuing Guaranty,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 Personal Guranty