Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:James D Cain, Jr
Referred: Thomas P Leblanc
Case #: 2:24-cv-00611
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Case Filed:May 08, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 08/06 3:53 PM
FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Santos Orellana-Hernandez in the amount of $405, receipt number 500002949. (crt,Williams, G)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 07/17 3:21 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $50.00. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 7/17/2024. (crt,Williams, K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 07/15 11:40 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Santos Orellana-Hernandez. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/10/2024.(crt,Haik, K)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope,
Att: 2 Proposed order
4 4 cmp Complaint Mon 07/15 11:36 AM
COMPLAINT against Felipe Martinez filed by Santos Orellana-Hernandez.(crt,Haik, K)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, June 24, 2024
3 3 order Sec P - Deficiency Order Wed 06/26 7:00 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. (Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 7/24/2024). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 6/24/2024.(crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1331 Bivens Complaint form,
Att: 2 In Forma Pauperis form
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
2 2 motion Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) Wed 05/15 2:58 PM
PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/15/2024. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/09 3:53 PM
COMPLAINT against F C I Oakdale II filed by Santos Orellana-Hernandez.(crt,Bowman, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/15 2:47 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]