Arizona District Court
Judge:Scott H Rash
Referred: Bruce G Macdonald
Case #: 4:24-cv-00238
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Case Filed:May 08, 2024
Terminated:Jul 30, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MST
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
5 5 order Clerks Judgment Tue 07/30 2:03 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed June 11, 2024, judgment is entered, the petition and action are dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's orders. (MCO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
4 4 18 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 06/11 12:34 PM
ORDER: Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner. Petitioner's Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 1), which the Court construes as a petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241, is DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Petitioner has 30 days from the date of filing of this Order to file an amended § 2241 petition in compliance with this Order. If Petitioner fails to file an amended petition within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action, without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Petitioner the current court-approved form for filing a "Petition Under 28 U.S.C. § 2241 For A Writ Of Habeas Corpus By A Person In Federal Custody" and the current court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Habeas). Signed by Judge Scott H Rash on 6/10/2024. (MCO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/29 12:27 PM
NOTICE re: Future Change of Address: USP TERRE HAUTE, U.S. PENITENTIARY, P.O. BOX 33, TERRE HAUTE, IN 47808 by Carlos Kidd. (2 page)(MCO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Assignment Thu 05/09 3:44 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (SCA)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) Thu 05/09 3:43 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by Carlos Kidd. (17 pages)(SCA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope