Arizona District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-08044
Case Filed:May 07, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 10, 2024 12:36 AM MST
Defendant
Luis Angel Pulido (1)
Represented By
Chalet Monique Braziel
Federal Public Defenders Office - Phoenix
contact info
Sarah Kosnoff Erlinder
Federal Public Defender'S Office - Flagstaff, Az
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Genevieve Alexandra Ozark
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 2:08 AM MST
Sunday, April 07, 2024
Arrest of Luis Angel Pulido on 4/7/2024. (CSD) [3:24-mj-04093-CDB]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Luis Angel Pulido on 4/7/2024. (CSD) [3:24-mj-04093-CDB]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Luis Angel Pulido. (CSD) [3:24-mj-04093-CDB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins: Initial Appearance as to Luis Angel Pulido held on 4/9/2024, see attached minute entry. Appointing Sarah Kosnoff Erlinder for Defendant with Appointment Type: AFPD. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Detention Hearing and Status Hearing regarding Preliminary Hearing set for 4/11/2024 at 10:30 AM in U.S. District Court of Arizona, 123 N. San Francisco Street, Suite 200, Flagstaff, AZ 86001 before Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles. Related [+] Hearing held 10:14 AM to 10:19 AM.(CSD) [3:24-mj-04093-CDB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins.(CSD)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [3:24-mj-04093-CDB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
6 6 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins: Detention Hearing as to Luis Angel Pulido held on 4/11/2024, see attached minute entry. Defendant ordered released to Third-Party Custodian with conditions. Preliminary Hearing waived on 4/11/2024. Finding: Probable cause found as to the charges against the defendant and defendant held to answer before District Court. Related [+] Hearing held 10:16 AM to 10:31 AM.(CSD) [3:24-mj-04093-CDB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
7 7 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release Third Party Custodian as to Luis Angel Pulido. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 4/11/24.(CSD) [3:24-mj-04093-CDB]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
8 8 NOTICE re: PASSPORT as to Luis Angel Pulido. Defendant is not permitted to apply for the issuance of a passport and/or passport card during the pendency of this action. (VE) [3:24-mj-04093-CDB]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER SUBSTITUTION: Chalet Braziel appearing for Luis Angel Pulido. Attorney Sarah Kosnoff Erlinder terminated . (Braziel, Chalet) [3:24-mj-04093-CDB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
10 10 INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Luis Angel Pulido count 1 with Forfeiture Allegation. Arraignment set for 5/15/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine. (KJ)
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
11 11 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles. No probable conflict re Judge Dominic W Lanza. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. Filed by USA as to Luis Angel Pulido. (KJ)
Related: [-]
13 13 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Luis Angel Pulido. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Summary