Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00783
Case Filed:May 07, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 10, 2024 12:45 AM MST
Defendant
Nereo Mejia Gomez, Jr. (1)
Represented By
Shaheen Payman Torgoley
Ryan Rapp Pacheco Sorensen PLC
contact info
Maritza Heras
Federal Public Defenders Office - Yuma
contact info
Jerald Joel Schreck
Schreck Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Gayle L Helart
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 2:24 AM MST
Thursday, April 18, 2024
Arrest of Nereo Mejia Gomez, Jr on 4/18/2024. (MAP) [2:24-mj-01647-JFM]
Related: [-]
1 1 MOTION to Seal Complaint / Case by USA as to Nereo Mejia Gomez, Jr. (MAP) [2:24-mj-01647-JFM]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal Complaint / Case as to Nereo Mejia Gomez Jr. (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 4/18/24. (cc: AUSA by JA NM)(MAP) [2:24-mj-01647-JFM]
Related: [-]
3 3 21 pgs *COMPLAINT as to Nereo Mejia Gomez, Jr (1). (MAP) (MAP). *Modified to add redacted complaint to entry, seal unredacted complaint pursuant to doc.12 on 4/30/2024 (MAP). [2:24-mj-01647-JFM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/30/2024) UNREDACTED Complaint & Probable Cause Statement
5 5 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/18/2024 as to Nereo Mejia Gomez, Jr. (MAP) [2:24-mj-01647-JFM]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
6 6 1 pgs MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf: Initial Appearance as to Nereo Mejia Gomez, Jr held on 4/19/2024. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Appointing Maritza Heras (AFPD) for Nereo Mejia Gomez, Jr. Preliminary Hearing waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Detention Hearing set for 4/29/2024 at 01:30 PM in U.S. District Court of Arizona, 98 West 1st Street, Yuma, AZ 85364 before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf. OTHER: The Government requests that this matter remain sealed until such time as assigned AUSA Gayle Helart has been contacted. Related [+] Hearing held 12:43 PM to 12:53 PM. (cc: AUSA/AFPD/PTS)(MAP) [2:24-mj-01647-JFM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
7 7 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Nereo Mejia Gomez, Jr. (MAP) [2:24-mj-01647-JFM]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
9 9 MOTION to Permanently Seal Original Statement of Probable Cause by USA as to Nereo Mejia Gomez, Jr. (MAP) [2:24-mj-01647-JFM]
Related: [-]
10 10 21 pgs *FILED at Doc.3 *LODGED Proposed REDACTED Complaint and Probable Cause Statement by USA as to Nereo Mejia Gomez, Jr re:9 motion to seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if motion to seal is granted. (MAP) *Modified on 4/30/2024 (MAP). [2:24-mj-01647-JFM]
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs ORDER granting9 Motion to Permanently Seal Original Complaint and Statement of Probable Cause Seal as to Nereo Mejia Gomez Jr. (1). FURTHER ORDERED that the Redacted Complaint and Statement of Probable Cause shall be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 4/26/24. (cc: AUSA) (MAP) [2:24-mj-01647-JFM]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
13 13 1 pgs MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf: Detention Hearing as to Nereo Mejia Gomez, Jr held on 4/29/2024. The Government moves to unseal the case and further unseal the redacted complaint and redacted probable cause statement. SO ORDERED. ORDERED denying 11 Motion for Detention as to Nereo Mejia Gomez Jr. (1). Court accepts recommendation by Pretrial Services and Orders defendant released BAG ANDBAGGAGE from the John M. Roll Courthouse on April 30, 2024 by the U.S. Marshals Service at 8:30 AM. Related [+] Hearing held 1:28 PM to 2:00 PM.(MAP) [2:24-mj-01647-JFM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
14 14 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Nereo Mejia Gomez, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 4/29/2024.(MM) [2:24-mj-01647-JFM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
15 15 NOTICE re: PASSPORT as to Nereo Mejia Gomez, Jr. Defendant is not permitted to apply for the issuance of a passport and/or passport card during the pendency of this action. (VE) [2:24-mj-01647-JFM]
Related: [-]
16 16 NOTICE re SURRENDER of Passport as to Nereo Mejia Gomez, Jr. Issued by United States. Defendant not permitted to apply for passport/passport card during the pendency of this action. (VE) [2:24-mj-01647-JFM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
17 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to attorney Maritza Heras, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Nereo Mejia Gomez, Jr.(Heras, Maritza) [2:24-mj-01647-JFM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
18 18 ORDER granting17 Motion to Withdraw as to Assistant Federal Public Defendant Maritza Heras and the office of the Federal Public Defender be relieved as counsel of record in this case as to Nereo Mejia Gomez Jr. (1); granting17 Motion to Appoint CJA Panel Attorney Jerald Joel Schreck as attorney of record for all further proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case be transferred to Phoenix for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 5/7/24.(JMA) [2:24-mj-01647-JFM]
Related: [-]
20 20 7 pgs INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Nereo Mejia Gomez, Jr (1) count(s) 1-4, 5-9, 10, 11 with Forfeiture Allegations. Arraignment set for 5/15/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine. (EJA)
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
21 21 3 pgs DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles. No probable conflict re Judge Dominic W Lanza. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. Filed by USA as to Nereo Mejia Gomez, Jr. (EJA)
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER as to Nereo Mejia Gomez, Jr: The provisions of 18 U.S.C. 3509 apply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus on 5/7/24.(EJA)
Related: [-]
25 25 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Nereo Mejia Gomez, Jr. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Summary