Illinois Central District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-30021
Case Filed:May 07, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 10, 2024 2:20 AM CDT
Defendant
Gregory L Fraase (1)
Defendant
Rao Guangxiang (2)
Represented By
Daniel Alan Noll
Noll Law Office LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Tanner K Jacobs
Us Atty
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 10:32 AM CDT
Friday, April 19, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Rao Guangxiang (1). (MJC) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/25/2024) (MJC). [3:24-mj-03050-KLM]
Related: [-]
2 2 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - ORIGINAL DOCUMENT -- COMPLAINT -- UNREDACTED (MJC) [3:24-mj-03050-KLM]
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 21, 2024
Arrest of Rao Guangxiang (RES) [3:24-mj-03050-KLM]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Rao Guangxiang. (GL) [3:24-mj-03050-KLM]
Related: [-]
ORDER granting Oral Motion to Unseal Case as to Rao Guangxiang (1). Entered by Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught on 4/22/2024. (GL) [3:24-mj-03050-KLM]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught: Initial Appearance on Criminal Complaint as to Rao Guangxiang held via VIDEO on 4/22/2024. The Judge is present in person in the courtroom. AUSA Tanner Jacobs present on behalf of the Government. Defendant present in custody from a detention facility. Attorney Daniel Noll present for possible CJA appointment. Interpreter sworn. Defendant advised of charges. Defendant consents to hearing by video. Defendant advised of rights. Defendant advised she intends to retain counsel to represent her in this matter. Government states statutory penalties. Government seeks detention. Status conference to be held 4/24/2024 at 11:00 a.m. via video before Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught. Defense counsel to enter appearance prior to hearing. If none entered, Attorney Daniel Noll to be present as back up counsel. Government advised of obligations under Brady v. Maryland and advised of the possible consequences of violating such obligations. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Hearing adjourned. (Tape #SP-C 3:53 PM.) (GL) [3:24-mj-03050-KLM]
Related: [-]
4 4 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/21/2024 as to Rao Guangxiang. (RES) [3:24-mj-03050-KLM]
Related: [-]
5 5 TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught on 4/22/2024. Initial Appearance on a Complaint set for defendant Rao Guangxiang on 4/22/2024 at 3:30 p.m. via video before Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught. Defendant and all counsel to appear via video. Video conference instructions are attached. (RES) [3:24-mj-03050-KLM]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) as to Rao Guangxiang. (SEE WRITTEN ORDER.) Entered by Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught on 4/22/2024. (GL) [3:24-mj-03050-KLM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
6 6 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT . (MJC) [3:24-mj-03050-KLM]
Related: [-]
7 7 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT . (MJC) [3:24-mj-03050-KLM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught: Status Conference as to Rao Guangxiang held via VIDEO on 4/24/2024. The Judge is present in person in the courtroom. AUSA Sierra Senor-Moore present on behalf of the Government. Defendant present in custody from a detention facility. Attorney Daniel Noll present for possible CJA appointment. Interpreter sworn. Discussion held regarding retention of counsel. Defendant does not object to attorney Daniel Noll's appointment. Court appoints Daniel Noll to represent Defendant. Attorney Noll accepts the appointment. Status Conference continued to 5/1/2024 at 2:30 PM via video conference before Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Hearing adjourned. (Tape #SP-3 11:17 AM) (MJC) [3:24-mj-03050-KLM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
9 9 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT . (MJC) [3:24-mj-03050-KLM]
Related: [-]
10 10 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT . (MJC) [3:24-mj-03050-KLM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen L. McNaught: Status Conference held on 5/1/2024 via video. AUSA Tanner Jacobs present on behalf of the Government via video. Defendant present in custody from a detention facility. Attorney Daniel Noll present on behalf of the Defendant via video. Interpreter sworn. Discussion held regarding representation for Defendant. Detention Hearing held. Parties proffer evidence. Arguments heard. Defendant ordered detained. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Preliminary Hearing held. Hearing adjourned. (Tape #SP-3 2:38.) (JPL) [3:24-mj-03050-KLM]
Related: [-]
11 11 + + PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Rao Guangxiang (LG) [3:24-mj-03050-KLM]
Related: [-]
12 12 + + FIRST PRETRIAL SERVICE REPORT ADDENDUM as to Rao Guangxiang (LG) [3:24-mj-03050-KLM]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
13 13 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Rao Guangxiang. Entered by Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught on 5/3/2024. (MJC) [3:24-mj-03050-KLM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
14 14 7 pgs INDICTMENT as to Gregory L Fraase (1) count(s) 1, Rao Guangxiang (2) count(s) 1. (TK)
Related: [-]
15 15 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - ORIGINAL Indictment UNREDACTED (TK)
Related: [-]
16 16 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET as to Gregory Fraase. (TK)
Related: [-]
17 17 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET as to Rao Guangxiang. (TK)
Related: [-]