Oklahoma Northern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00146
Case Filed:May 08, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 10, 2024 2:38 AM CDT
Defendant
Kelly Wayne Bolden (1)
Represented By
Robert Allen Ridenour
Federal Public Defender'S Office (tulsa)
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Stephanie Noel Ihler
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/19/2024 11:36 PM CST
Friday, April 12, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT approved by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele by USA as to Kelly Wayne Bolden (1) (ll, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00273-MTS]
Related: [-]
2 2 WARRANT Issued by Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele as to Kelly Wayne Bolden (ll, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00273-MTS]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
3 3 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Kelly Wayne Bolden (Ihler, Stephanie) Modified on 4/18/2024 - WITHDRAWN per 9 (lmt, Dpty Clk). [4:24-mj-00273-MTS]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for Hearing Related [+] by USA as to Kelly Wayne Bolden (Ihler, Stephanie) [4:24-mj-00273-MTS]
Related: [-] 3 MOTION for Detention
5 5 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne: Initial Appearance held on 4/15/2024 , appointing FPD attorney Robert Allen Ridenour for Kelly Wayne Bolden, ruling on motion(s)/document(s): #4 granted, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Detention Hearing set for 4/17/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne, Preliminary Hearing set for 4/17/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne), ordering defendant be detained as to Kelly Wayne Bolden Related [+] (Court Reporter: C1) (ll, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00273-MTS]
Related: [-] 4 MOTION for Hearing
6 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne , appointing FPD attorney as to Kelly Wayne Bolden (ll, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00273-MTS]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne , ordering defendant be detained as to Kelly Wayne Bolden (ll, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00273-MTS]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne re: Brady as to Kelly Wayne Bolden (ll, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00273-MTS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
9 9 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne: Detention Hearing held on 4/17/2024 , Preliminary Examination held on 4/17/2024 , striking/withdrawing document(s), setting/resetting bond, striking/terminating deadline(s)/hearing(s) as to Kelly Wayne Bolden Related [+] (Documents Terminated:3 MOTION for Detention ) (Court Reporter: C1) (tjc, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00273-MTS]
Related: [-] 3 MOTION for Detention
10 10 BOND approved by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne as to Kelly Wayne Bolden (tjc, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00273-MTS]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne , setting conditions of release as to Kelly Wayne Bolden (tjc, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00273-MTS]
Related: [-]
12 12 WARRANT Returned Executed as to Kelly Wayne Bolden (ll, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00273-MTS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
13 13 DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET(S) by USA as to Kelly Wayne Bolden (clb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
14 14 INDICTMENT by USA as to Kelly Wayne Bolden (1) count(s) 1 (clb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
15 15 SEALED UNREDACTED VERSION of Dkt #14 per FRCrP 49.1(f) (clb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
16 16 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Kelly Wayne Bolden (clb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]