Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-00276
Case Filed:May 08, 2024
Terminated:Jun 06, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 10, 2024 2:19 AM CDT
Defendant
Roberto Emiliano-Mata (1)
Represented By
Leonardo Rincones, Jr
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
William F. Hagen
Assistant Us Attorney
contact info
Asst United States Attorney Br-Mag Duty
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/25/2024 1:38 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III: INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint held on 5/8/2024 as to Roberto Emiliano Mata. Defendant placed under oath. Defendant's First Appearance; advised of charges and rights. Defendant examined by U.S. Probation Office. Defendant WAIVES court appointed counsel. Preliminary Examination hearing set for 05/13/2024 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt. Defendant held without bond; Detention Hearing set for 05/13/2024 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt. In accordance with Rule 5(f), as amended by the Due Process Protections Act, on October 21, 2020, the Government is hereby notified of and is ordered to comply with disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny and the possible consequences of violating this order. Defendant remanded to the custody of the US Marshal. Appearances: AUSA: I Cano, USPO: S Contreras, DUSM: R Haralson, ERO: J Tabares, Interpreter: M Hanson (09:30-09:50am)(mp1)
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Hearing/Prelim Exam/Prelim Exam & Detention Hearing as to Roberto Emiliano Mata: Detention Hearing set for 5/13/2024 at 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen Betancourt (mp1)
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. William F. Hagen appearing for USA, filed. (Hagen, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs COMPLAINT as to Roberto Emiliano Mata (1), filed. (jmt1) (jmt1).
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet; Date of Arrest: 5/7/24 as to Roberto Emiliano Mata, filed. (jmt1) (jmt1).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/8/2024) Unredacted attachment
3 3 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Roberto Emiliano Mata (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified. (mp1)
Related: [-]
4 4 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Roberto Emiliano-Mata, filed.
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Leonardo Rincones, Jr appearing for Roberto Emiliano-Mata , filed. (Rincones, Leonardo)
Related: [-]