Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-mj-00749
Case Filed:May 08, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 10, 2024 2:19 AM CDT
Defendant
Juan Alberto Camacho-Rodriguez (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - McAllen
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Amanda Rose McColgan
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 3:38 AM CDT
Monday, May 06, 2024
Arrest of Juan Alberto Camacho-Rodriguez, filed. (cb7)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. INITIAL APPEARANCE, PRELIMINARY HEARING, AND DETENTION HEARING on Criminal Complaint as to Juan Alberto Camacho-Rodriguez held on 5/8/2024. Defendant placed under oath. Defendant present in the courtroom. Defendant informed of legal rights, including the right to have a consular official notified about the arrest. Defendant affirmed that the Financial Affidavit was correct and requested court-appointed counsel, which the Court GRANTED. Federal Public Defender appointed to represent Defendant. The Court advised Defendant as to the charged offense and any factual allegations in the criminal complaint. Defendant, through counsel, waived both the Preliminary and Detention Hearings. The Court entered findings, on the record, and found probable cause. The Court also entered findings that Defendant was a flight risk and denied bond; a written order to follow. In accordance with Rule 5(f), the Court orally admonished the Government of its disclosure obligations under Brady and the consequences of failing to provide such disclosure; a written order to follow. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. Appearances: Avery Benitez, AUSA; Joe Jacinto, AFPD. (USPO: Susana Vargas) (ERO: Antonio Tijerina) (Interpreter: Maria E. Barrett and Woody Lewis, used) (DUSM: Jaime Torres). (jhacker, )
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Amanda Rose McColgan appearing for USA, filed. (McColgan, Amanda)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Juan Alberto Camacho-Rodriguez (1), filed. (Hidalgo) Initial Appearance set for 5/8/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker (cb7)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Juan Alberto Camacho-Rodriguez (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (jhacker, )
Related: [-]
3 3 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Juan Alberto Camacho-Rodriguez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (jhacker, )
Related: [-]
4 4 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Juan Alberto Camacho-Rodriguez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (jhacker, )
Related: [-]
5 5 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Juan Alberto Camacho-Rodriguez, filed.
Related: [-]
6 6 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Juan Alberto Camacho-Rodriguez, filed. (cb7)
Related: [-]