Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00186
Case Filed:May 08, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 10, 2024 2:22 AM CDT
Defendant
Leonardo Cando (1)
Represented By
Corpus Christi Interpreter
contact info
Francisco Morales
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Corpus Christi
contact info
Lila Michelle Garza
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Robert Douglas Thorpe, Jr
Assistant Us Atty
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 3:41 AM CDT
Sunday, April 28, 2024
Arrest of Leonardo Cando. (mlg2) [2:24-mj-00164]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Robert Douglas Thorpe, Jr appearing for USA, filed. (Thorpe, Robert) [2:24-mj-00164]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Leonardo Cando (1), filed. (Brooks) Initial Appearance set for 4/30/2024 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock (jdr2) [2:24-mj-00164]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified. (lmg2) [2:24-mj-00164]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
Interpreter needed as to Leonardo Cando. Language: SPANISH. Corpus Christi Interpreter for Leonardo Cando added. (mlg2) [2:24-mj-00164]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Leonardo Cando (Defendant informed of rights) held on 4/30/2024. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Court grants request for appointment of counsel. Defendant consents to this hearing by video conference. Rights to consular notification given. Counsel may notify AUSA if they request notification. The Court, on their own motion, orders a detention hearing. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 5/3/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. Appearances: Ashley Elizabeth Jurk Martin, AUSA; Rachel Braver for Defendant; USPO: Jesus Botello; USM: Deputy Byers, Tepera. (Digital # 9:49-10:02) (ERO: Nelda Garcia) (Interpreter: Juan Morales and Nathan Rhodes/used) Deft remanded to custody. (mlg2) [2:24-mj-00164]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Lila Michelle Garza, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Leonardo Cando, filed. (Garza, Lila) [2:24-mj-00164]
Related: [-]
3 3 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Leonardo Cando. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified. (mlg2) [2:24-mj-00164]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Francisco Morales, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Leonardo Cando, filed. (Morales, Francisco) [2:24-mj-00164]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
**Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Leonardo Cando: Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 5/3/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby are cancelled. Waiver filed. (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00164]
Related: [-]
4 4 WAIVER of Detention Without Prejudice and/or of Preliminary Hearing by Leonardo Cando, filed. (lg2) [2:24-mj-00164]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
5 5 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Leonardo Cando, filed. (rgr2) [2:24-mj-00164]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
6 6 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Leonardo Cando (1) count(s) 1, filed. (lg2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
7 7 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Leonardo Cando, filed. (lg2)
Related: [-]
8 8 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Leonardo Cando. Arraignment set for 5/15/2024 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby.. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby.. Jury Trial set for 7/8/2024 at 08:30 AM before Judge David S. Morales. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (lg2)
Related: [-]