Arizona District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-08036
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 10, 2024 12:49 AM MST
Defendant
Diego Eduardo Vega-Figueroa (1)
Represented By
Karina Janine Ordonez
Karina Ordonez Law Office PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jennifer Anne Corbet
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 2:31 AM MST
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
Arrest of Diego Eduardo Vega-Figueroa on 3/19/2024. (CSL) [3:24-mj-03126-MTM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Diego Eduardo Vega-Figueroa. (CSL) [3:24-mj-03126-MTM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey: Initial Appearance as to Diego Eduardo Vega-Figueroa held on 3/21/2024. DEFENDANT SWORN AS TO FINANCIAL STATUS. Appointing Karina Janine Ordonez for Defendant with Appointment Type: CJA. Detention Hearing submitted. Defendant ordered detained pending trial as a flight risk. Preliminary Hearing waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Spanish Interpreter required for Defendant. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA David Pimsner on behalf of Jennifer Corbet for the Government, CJA Attorney Karina Ordonez for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Beatriz Bogard assists Defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 3:18 PM to 3:20 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) [3:24-mj-03126-MTM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey.(KGM)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [3:24-mj-03126-MTM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Diego Eduardo Vega-Figueroa: The Court concludes that the following facts require the detention of the defendant pending trial in this case. Findings of Fact and Statement of Reasons: (1) There is probable cause to believe that the defendant has committed an offense. (2) There is a serious risk that the defendant will not appear. (3) Defendant is a citizen of another country, illegally in the United States of America. (4) Defendant does not have sufficient ties to the community. (5) The reports from Pretrial Services Agency are adopted as the further findings of this Magistrate Judge. Conclusions of Law: (1) There is a serious risk that the defendant will flee. (2) No condition or combination of conditions will reasonably assure the appearance of the defendant as required. Directions Regarding Detention: The defendant is committed to the custody of the Attorney General or his/her designated representative for confinement in a corrections facility separate, to the extent practicable, from persons awaiting or serving sentences or being held in custody pending appeal. The defendant shall be afforded a reasonable opportunity for private consultation with defense counsel. On order of a court of the United States or on request of an attorney for the Government, the person in charge of the corrections facility shall deliver the defendant to the United States Marshal for the purpose of an appearance in connection with a court proceeding. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 3/21/2024. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) [3:24-mj-03126-MTM]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
6 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by Diego Eduardo Vega-Figueroa.(Ordonez, Karina) [3:24-mj-03126-MTM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
7 7 ORDER granting6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Diego Eduardo Vega-Figueroa (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 3/25/24. (rkt) [3:24-mj-03126-MTM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
8 8 INFORMATION - Felony as to Diego Eduardo Vega-Figueroa (1) count(s) 1. (RMW)
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Diego Eduardo Vega-Figueroa. (RMW)
Related: [-]
10 10 CONSENT OF DEFENDANT Diego Eduardo Vega-Figueroa for Guilty Plea Hearing before a United States Magistrate Judge. (RMW)
Related: [-]
11 11 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles. No probable conflict re Judge Dominic W Lanza. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. Filed by USA as to Diego Eduardo Vega-Figueroa. (RMW)
Related: [-]
13 13 The parties having contacted the court, IT IS ORDERED, as to Diego Eduardo Vega-Figueroa, Change of Plea Hearing set for 4/25/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 302, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle.(rkt)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]