Missouri Western District Court
Case #: 6:24-cr-03048
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 10, 2024 3:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Michael G. Caldwell (1)
Represented By
Megan Chalifoux
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Steven R Berry
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
John Michael Herries
Doj-Usao
contact info
Stephanie Wan
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Aug 29 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Michael G. Caldwell. Objections to R&R due by 9/12/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Berziel, Karla)
GPO Sep 13 2024
ACCEPTANCE of Plea of guilty and Adjudication of Guilt re 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Michael G. Caldwell (1). Signed on 9/13/2024 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Hanna, Jaime)

Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 5:31 AM CDT
Thursday, April 04, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Michael G. Caldwell (1). (Siegert, Karen) [6:24-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A,
Att: 2 Attachment B
2 2 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Stephanie Wan appearing for USA. (Attorney Stephanie Wan added to party USA(pty:pla))(Wan, Stephanie) [6:24-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
3 3 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Michael G. Caldwell. This is the official notice for this hearing. Initial Appearance set for 4/5/2024 10:45 AM in MJ Courtroom, Springfield (DPR) before Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Furtak, Rebecca) [6:24-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David P. Rush: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Michael G. Caldwell held on 4/5/2024. Time in court: 10:38 a.m. to 10:40 a.m.. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Rebecca Furtak, 417-225-7703. DEFENDANT IN CUSTODY. (Furtak, Rebecca) [6:24-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
5 5 Pro Se Oral MOTION to appoint counsel by Michael G. Caldwell. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/19/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca) [6:24-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Steven R Berry appointed for Michael G. Caldwell. (Furtak, Rebecca) [6:24-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Michael G. Caldwell. This is the official notice for this hearing. Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing set for 4/10/2024 09:00 AM in MJ Courtroom, Springfield (DPR) before Magistrate Judge David P. Rush.(Furtak, Rebecca) [6:24-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
8 8 ARREST WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED on 4/4/2024 as to Michael G. Caldwell. Pursuant to the E-Government Act and Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure 49.1(a), access to this document is restricted to case participants and the court. (Furtak, Rebecca) [6:24-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Megan Chalifoux appearing for Michael G. Caldwell. (Attorney Megan Chalifoux added to party Michael G. Caldwell(pty:dft))(Chalifoux, Megan) [6:24-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
10 10 MOTION for detention hearing by USA as to Michael G. Caldwell. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/22/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Wan, Stephanie) [6:24-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
12 12 BOND REPORT as to Michael G. Caldwell. Document is available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter PACER login and password first for authentication. (Wells, Lyndsey) [6:24-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David P. Rush: PRELIMINARY HEARING and DETENTION HEARING as to Michael G. Caldwell held on 4/10/2024. Time in court: 9:08 a.m. to 9:15 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Karla Berziel, 417-865-3869. DEFENDANT IN CUSTODY. (Berziel, Karla) [6:24-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER as to Michael G. Caldwell. (Berziel, Karla) [6:24-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Michael G. Caldwell (1). (Berziel, Karla) [6:24-mj-02026-DPR]
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs INDICTMENT as to Michael G. Caldwell (1) count(s) 1-2. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
17 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David P. Rush as to Michael G. Caldwell. Signed on 4/10/2024 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER AUTHORIZING TEMPORARY TRANSFER OF CUSTODY ON CONSENT as to Michael G. Caldwell. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
19 19 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Michael G. Caldwell. This is the official notice for this hearing. Initial Appearance, Arraignment and Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2024 at 9:30 AM in MJ Courtroom, Springfield (DPR) before Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berziel, Karla)
Related: [-]