Oregon District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00155
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 10, 2024 12:32 AM PDT
Defendant
Amigos Mexican Cuisine & Cantina LLC (1)
Represented By
Justin T. Rusk
Janet Hoffman & Associates LLC
contact info
Janet Lee Hoffman
Janet Hoffman & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Meredith Bateman
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 2:15 AM PDT
Tuesday, March 01, 2022
1 1 Sealed Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke as to Vinod Mehta (1). (jkm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Criminal Complaint
4 4 ORDER Granting 3 Motion to Seal Case as to Vinod Mehta (1) (Copy to AUSA) Signed on 3/1/2022 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2022
5 5 Motion to Quash Arrest Warrant and Issue Summons regarding 2 Arrest Warrant Issued. filed by USA as to Defendant Vinod Mehta. (jkm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Granting5 Motion to Quash Arrest Warrant and Issue Summons as to Vinod Mehta (1). Signed on 3/11/2022 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (Copy to AUSA) (Three certified copies forwarded to U.S. Marshal on 3/11/2022.) (jkm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2022
9 9 Scheduling Order as to Vinod Mehta Status Conference is set for 5/2/2022 at 01:30PM in Medford by telephone or Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
10 10 Minutes of Proceedings : First Appearance held on 3/23/2022 before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You by Vinod Mehta. Government's oral unopposed motion to unseal case is granted. Defendant waives an in-person appearance and appears by video on summons. Retained Attorney present: Janet Lee Hoffman for Vinod Mehta. Defendant advised of rights, waives a preliminary hearing, and enters a not guilty plea. Defendant's Location-Custody status is: Released on his own recognizance; release order filed separately. Brady Disclosure Order: Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the government is advised of its obligations under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. See attached Order. ORDER - SETTING Arraignment for Friday, 4/22/2022 at 1:30PM in Medford by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: John Brassell. Counsel Present for Defendant: Janet Hoffman and Chris Heywood. (Court Reporter Dennis Apodaca) (pvh) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
11 11 Order Setting Conditions of Release as to Defendant Vinod Mehta. Signed on 3/23/2022 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (kemc). [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
12 12 Joint Motion for Waiver of Speedy Indictment by Vinod Mehta (Brassell, John) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
13 13 ORDER Granting12 Joint Motion for Waiver of Speedy Indictment by Vinod Mehta (1). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
14 14 Motion for Protective Order filed by USA as to Defendant Vinod Mehta. (Brassell, John) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 01, 2022
15 15 PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting14 Motion for Protective Order as to Vinod Mehta (1). Please access entire text by document number hyperlink. Signed on 04/01/2022 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
16 16 Scheduling Order as to Vinod Mehta. The Arraignment set for 04/22/2022 is vacated. The Status Conference set for 05/02/2022 at 1:30 PM remains as set. Counsel and defendant waive presentment of Indictment up and until 05/02/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2022
17 17 Waiver of Presentment of Indictment by Vinod Mehta (Hoffman, Janet) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
18 18 Waiver of Appearance by Vinod Mehta (Hoffman, Janet) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
19 19 Second Waiver of Presentment of Indictment by Vinod Mehta (Hoffman, Janet) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
20 20 Minutes of Proceedings: Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke as to Vinod Mehta. Counsel and defendant waive presentment of Indictment for an additional 30 days. Status Conference is reset for 6/27/2022 at 01:30PM in Medford by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke.Counsel Present for Plaintiff: John Brassell. Counsel Present for Defendant: Janet Hoffman. Defendant waived appearance. (USPO Present: Juan Gonzalez) (FTR: Medford Courtroom 2) (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
21 21 Notice of Attorney Appearance appearing for Vinod Mehta (Rusk, Justin) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
22 22 Waiver of of Defendant's Appearance at Status Conference by Vinod Mehta (Rusk, Justin) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
23 23 Minutes of Proceedings: Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke as to Vinod Mehta. Defendant and counsel waive presentment of Indictment up and until 08/29/2022. Status Conference is reset for 8/29/2022 at 01:30PM in Medford by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke.Counsel Present for Plaintiff: John Brassell. Counsel Present for Defendant: Janet Hoffman. Defendant waived appearance. (FTR: Medford Courtroom 2) (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
24 24 Notice of Attorney Substitution: Attorney Meredith D.M. Bateman added for Plaintiff USA regarding Defendant Vinod Mehta in place and stead of Attorney John C. Brassell. (Bateman, Meredith) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
25 25 Minutes of Proceedings: Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke as to Vinod Mehta. Counsel and defendant waive presentment of Indictment up and until 10/11/2022. Status Conference is reset for 10/11/2022 at 01:30PM in Medford by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke.Counsel Present for Plaintiff: John Brassell on behalf of Meredith Bateman. Counsel Present for Defendant: Justin Rusk. Defendant waived appearance.(USPO Present: Cassidy Wilson) (FTR: Medford Courtroom 2) (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
26 26 Minutes of Proceedings: Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke as to Vinod Mehta. Counsel and defendant waive presentment of Indictment up and until 12/12/2022. Status Conference is reset for 12/12/2022 at 01:30PM in Medford by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke.Counsel Present for Plaintiff: John Brassell for Meredith Bateman. Counsel Present for Defendant: Justin Rusk. Defendant waived appearance.(USPO Present: Juan) ( FTR: Medford Courtroom 2) (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
27 27 Minutes of Proceedings: Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke as to Vinod Mehta. Counsel and defendant waive presentment of Indictment up and until 01/09/2023. Status Conference is reset for 1/9/2023 at 01:30PM in Medford by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke.Counsel Present for Plaintiff: John Brassell for Meredith Bateman. Counsel Present for Defendant: Justin Rusk. Defendant waived appearance.(USPO Present: Cassidy Wilson) (FTR: Medford Courtroom 2) (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
28 28 Minutes of Proceedings: Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke as to Vinod Mehta. Counsel and defendant waive presentment of Indictment up and until 02/13/2023. Status Conference is reset for 2/13/2023 at 01:30PM in Medford by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: John Brassell for Meredith Bateman. Counsel Present for Defendant: Justin Rusk. Defendant waived appearance.(FTR: Medford Courtroom 2) (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
29 29 Minutes of Proceedings: Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke as to Vinod Mehta. Counsel and defendant waive presentment of Indictment up and until 04/10/2023. Status Conference is reset for 4/10/2023 at 01:30PM in Medford by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Counsel Present for Plaintiff: John Brassell for Meredith Bateman. Counsel Present for Defendant: Justin Rusk. Defendant waived appearance.(USPO Present: Juan Gonzalez) (FTR: Medford Courtroom 2) (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
30 30 Minutes of Proceedings: Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke as to Vinod Mehta. Counsel and defendant waive presentment of Indictment up and until 06/05/2023. Status Conference is reset for 6/5/2023 at 01:30PM in Medford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Counsel Present for Government: John Brassell on behalf of Judith Harper. Counsel Present for Defendant: Justin Rusk. Defendant waived appearance.(USPO Present: Juan Gonzalez) (FTR: Medford Courtroom 2) (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
31 31 Minutes of Proceedings: Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke as to Vinod Mehta. Counsel and defendant waive presentment of Indictment up and until 07/10/2023. Status Conference is reset for 7/10/2023 at 01:30PM in Medford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Counsel Present for Government: John Brassell for Meredith Bateman. Counsel Present for Defendant: Justin Rusk. Defendant waived appearance.(USPO Present: Juan Gonzalez) (FTR: Medford Courtroom 2) (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
32 32 Minutes of Proceedings: Status Conference before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke as to Vinod Mehta. Counsel and defendant waive presentment of Indictment up and until 8/7/2023. Status Conference is reset for 8/7/2023 at 01:30PM in Medford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Counsel Present for Government: Marco Boccato on behalf of Meredith Bateman and John Brassell. Counsel Present for Defendant: Justin Rusk. Defendant waived appearance. ( Present: PTS: Cassidy Wilson) ( FTR: Medford Courtroom 2) (jkm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
33 33 Minutes of Proceedings: Status Conference before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke as to Vinod Mehta. Counsel and defendant waive presentment of Indictment up and until 9/5/2023. Status Conference is set for 9/5/2023 at 01:30PM in Medford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Counsel Present for Government: Marco Boccato for Meredith Bateman/John Brassell. Counsel Present for Defendant: Justin Rusk. Defendant waived appearance. (Present: PTO: Juan Gonzalez) ( FTR: Medford Courtroom 2) (jkm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
34 34 Scheduling Order as to Vinod Mehta. The Status Conference set for 09/05/2023 at 1:30 PM has been RESET for 8/28/2023 at 01:30PM in Medford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
35 35 Minutes of Proceedings: Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke as to Vinod Mehta. Counsel and defendant waive presentment of Indictment up and until 10/02/2023. Status Conference is reset for 10/2/2023 at 01:30PM in Medford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Counsel Present for Government: Judith Harper for Meredith Batemen. Counsel Present for Defendant: Justin Rusk. Defendant waived appearance. (USPO Present: Cassidy Wilson) (FTR: Medford Courtroom 2) (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
36 36 Scheduling Order as to Vinod Mehta. The Status Conference set for 10/02/2023 at 1:30 PM has been RESET for 9/25/2023 at 01:30PM in Medford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
37 37 Scheduling Order as to Vinod Mehta. At the request of counsel, the Status Conference set for 09/25/2023 has been RESET for 10/10/2023 at 01:30PM in Medford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
38 38 Minutes of Proceedings: Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke as to Vinod Mehta. Counsel and defendant waive presentment of Indictment up and until 11/06/2023. Status Conference is reset for 11/6/2023 at 01:30PM in Medford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Counsel Present for Government: Marco Boccato for Meredith Bateman. Counsel Present for Defendant: Justin Rusk. Defendant waived appearance.(USPO Present: Juan Gonzalez) (FTR: Medford Courtroom 2) (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
39 39 Minutes of Proceedings: Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke as to Vinod Mehta. Counsel and defendant waive presentment of Indictment up and until 12/11/2023. Status Conference is reset for 12/11/2023 at 01:30PM in Medford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Counsel Present for Government: Marco Boccato for Meredith Bateman. Counsel Present for Defendant: Justin Rusk. Defendant waived appearance.(USPO Present: Cassidy Wilson) (Court Reporter Kendra Steppler) (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
40 40 Minutes of Proceedings: Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke as to Vinod Mehta. Counsel and defendant waive presentment of Indictment up and until 01/08/2024. Status Conference is reset for 1/8/2024 at 01:30PM in Medford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Counsel Present for Government: Marco Boccato on behalf of Meredith Batement. Counsel Present for Defendant: Justin Rusk. Defendant waived appearance.(USPO Present: Cassidy Wilson) (FTR: Medford Courtroom 2) (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
41 41 Scheduling Order as to Vinod Mehta. Due to the Court's unavailability, the Status Conference set for 01/08/2024 at 1:30 PM has been RESET for 1/16/2024 at 01:30PM in Medford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
42 42 Scheduling Order as to Vinod Mehta. At the request of counsel, the Status Conference set for 01/16/2024 is RESET for 2/12/2024 at 01:30PM in Medford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Counsel confirms that defendant waives presentment of Indictment up and until 02/12/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
43 43 Scheduling Order as to Vinod Mehta. The Status Conference set for 02/12/2024 at 1:30 PM has been RESET for 2/20/2024 at 01:30PM in Medford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
44 44 Minutes of Proceedings: Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke as to Vinod Mehta. Counsel confirms that defendant waives presentment of Indictment up and until 03/18/2024. Status Conference is reset for 3/18/2024 at 01:30PM in Medford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Counsel Present for Government: Marco Boccato on behalf of Meredith Batemen. Counsel Present for Defendant: Justin Rusk by videoconference. Defendant waived appearance.(FTR: Medford Courtroom 2) (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
45 45 Minutes of Proceedings: Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke as to Vinod Mehta. Counsel confirms that defendant waives presentment of Indictment up and until 05/13/2024. Status Conference is reset for 5/13/2024 at 01:30PM in Medford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Counsel Present for Government: John Brassell for Meredith Bateman. Counsel Present for Defendant: Justin Rusk. Defendant waived appearance.(USPO Present: Juan Gonzalez) (FTR: Medford Courtroom 2) (rsm) [1:22-mj-00037-CL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
46 46 Information as to Amigos Mexican Cuisine & Cantina LLC (1). Count 1: Theft of Government Benefits (ecp)
Related: [-]
47 47 Defendant Information Relative to a Criminal Case Sheet as to Defendant Amigos Mexican Cuisine & Cantina LLC. (In accordance with Fed. R. Crim. P. 49.1 this form document containing personal data identifiers is filed under seal) . (ecp)
Related: [-]