Original Case: 4:19-cv-00075

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-01981
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:May 09, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 10, 2024 3:15 AM CDT
Defendant
BJC Healthcare
Defendant
Washington University, also known as Washington University School of Medicine
Defendant
Thomas Cox
Defendant
Richard Benzinger
Defendant
Alex Evers
Defendant - Appellant
Barnes Jewish Hospital
Represented By
Theresa Marie Mullineaux
HUSCH & BLACKWELL
contact info
Michael P. Nolan
HUSCH & BLACKWELL
contact info
JoAnn T. Sandifer
HUSCH & BLACKWELL
contact info
Blake Ryan Armstrong
HUSCH & BLACKWELL
contact info
Plaintiff
Strategic Biomedical, Inc.
Plaintiff - Appellee
Jeffery Weisman
Represented By
Teresa Dale Pupillo
CAPES & SOKOL
contact info
Jonathan Theodore Sternberg
JONATHAN STERNBERG, P.C.
contact info
Edward R. Moor
MOOR LAW OFFICE PC
contact info
Sanford Jay Boxerman
NEILL & SCHWERIN
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 3:15 AM CDT
Thursday, May 09, 2024
5 pgs Civil case docketed. [5392227] 24-1981 (RDB)
Related: [-]
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of cross-appeal, docket entries, Order dated 3/25/2024, Judgment dated 3/25/2024 [5392231] 24-1981 (RDB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 51 pgs NOA Packet
Att: 2 61 pgs NOA Packet w/ Judgment
2 pgs CROSS APPEAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: 24-1864 Transcript due on or before 06/04/2024, and 24-1980 and 24-1981 Transcript due on or before 06/18/2024. BRIEF APPELLANT, Strategic Biomedical, Inc. and Jeffery Weisman due 06/14/2024. Appendix due 06/14/2024. Appellee/cross Appellant brief due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant's brief. [5392239] 24-1864 24-1980 24-1981 (RDB)
Related: [-]