Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Paul L Maloney
Referred: Phillip J Green
Case #: 2:24-cv-00075
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal-Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 10, 2024
Case in other court:Ontonagon County Circuit, 24-000018-CZ
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 06, 2024 4:15 AM EST
defendant
Ontonagon, County of
Represented By
Magy Shenouda
Clark Hill Plc (birmingham)
contact info
Miranda Marie Boulahanis
Clark Hill Plc (detroit)
contact info
Charles Allen Lawler
Clark Hill Plc (lansing)
contact info
plaintiff
Michael Laukka
Represented By
Sharon S. Almonrode
Miller Law Firm (rochester)
contact info
Donald R. Visser
Visser And Associates PLLC
contact info
Philip Lee Ellison
Outside Legal Counsel PLC
contact info
Christopher D. Kaye
Miller Law Firm (rochester)
contact info
Matthew Edwin Gronda
Gronda, PLC
contact info
Daniel O. Myers
Visser And Associates PLLC
contact info
E. Thomas McCarthy
Smith Haughey Rice & Roegge Pc (grand Rapids)
contact info
E. Powell Miller
Miller Law Firm (rochester)
contact info
Brandon T. Goldstein
Miller Law Firm (rochester)
contact info
plaintiff
Heidi Wettberg
Represented By
Sharon S. Almonrode
Miller Law Firm (rochester)
contact info
Donald R. Visser
Visser And Associates PLLC
contact info
Philip Lee Ellison
Outside Legal Counsel PLC
contact info
Christopher D. Kaye
Miller Law Firm (rochester)
contact info
Matthew Edwin Gronda
Gronda, PLC
contact info
Daniel O. Myers
Visser And Associates PLLC
contact info
E. Thomas McCarthy
Smith Haughey Rice & Roegge Pc (grand Rapids)
contact info
E. Powell Miller
Miller Law Firm (rochester)
contact info
Brandon T. Goldstein
Miller Law Firm (rochester)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
defendant
Michele Smith
Terminated: 09/05/2024
Represented By
Magy Shenouda
Clark Hill Plc (birmingham)
contact info
Charles Allen Lawler
Clark Hill Plc (lansing)
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/06 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by plaintiffs Michael Laukka, Heidi Wettberg (Myers, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, September 05, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 09/05 9:18 AM
ORDER approving STIPULATION18 ; dismissing claims as to defendant Michele Smith; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
18 18 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Wed 09/04 11:41 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Dismiss Treasurer by plaintiffs Michael Laukka, Heidi Wettberg (Myers, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Mon 08/05 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by plaintiffs Michael Laukka, Heidi Wettberg (Miller, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Schafer vs Kent
Friday, July 19, 2024
16 16 respm Certificate of Compliance Regarding Word Count Fri 07/19 10:00 AM
CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Reply to Response to Motion15 to Dismiss filed by Ontonagon, County of, Michele Smith (Lawler, Charles)
Related: [-]
15 15 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 07/19 9:55 AM
REPLY to response to motion11 to Dismiss filed by Ontonagon, County of, Michele Smith (Lawler, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
notice Attorney Appearance Mon 07/01 4:04 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brandon T. Goldstein on behalf of plaintiffs Michael Laukka, Heidi Wettberg (Goldstein, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
14 14 respm Response to Motion Fri 06/28 1:20 PM
RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint 11 filed by Michael Laukka, Heidi Wettberg (Miller, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Tolling Spreadsheet
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 06/28 10:55 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of E. Thomas McCarthy on behalf of plaintiffs Michael Laukka, Heidi Wettberg (McCarthy, E.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Regarding Response to Motion Thu 05/30 3:38 PM
ORDER regarding response to Motion to Dismiss11 ; responses due 6/28/2024; replies due by 7/19/2024; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
12 12 respm Certificate of Compliance Regarding Word Count Tue 05/28 3:12 PM
CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for MOTION to dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint 11 filed by Ontonagon, County of, Michele Smith (Lawler, Charles)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss Tue 05/28 2:21 PM
MOTION to dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by defendants Ontonagon, County of, Michele Smith; (Lawler, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Laukka Property Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Laukka Property Quit Claim Deed,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Wettberg Property Notices,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Wettberg Properties Quit Claim Deed,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Excerpt of Wayside Docket
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Hearing Wed 05/22 1:36 PM
ORDER denying7 motion for status conference; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
notice Attorney Appearance Thu 05/16 9:37 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Miranda Marie Boulahanis on behalf of defendant Ontonagon, County of (Boulahanis, Miranda)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Thu 05/16 11:06 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Matthew Edwin Gronda on behalf of plaintiffs Michael Laukka, Heidi Wettberg (Gronda, Matthew)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Thu 05/16 11:08 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Philip Lee Ellison on behalf of plaintiffs Michael Laukka, Heidi Wettberg (Ellison, Philip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
9 9 respm Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence Wed 05/15 6:13 PM
CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for hearing (Status Conference) 7 filed by Michael Laukka, Heidi Wettberg (Myers, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
8 8 respm Brief in Support of a Motion Wed 05/15 6:12 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION for hearing (Status Conference) 7 filed by Michael Laukka, Heidi Wettberg (Myers, Daniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Hearing Wed 05/15 6:11 PM
MOTION for hearing (Status Conference) by plaintiffs Michael Laukka, Heidi Wettberg; (Myers, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
6 6 order Stipulation and Order Wed 05/15 9:03 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for defendants Ontonagon County and Michele Smith to file response to complaint extended to 5/28/2024; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
5 5 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Tue 05/14 8:50 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by defendants Ontonagon, County of, Michele Smith (Lawler, Charles)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Tue 05/14 1:01 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of E. Powell Miller on behalf of plaintiffs Michael Laukka, Heidi Wettberg (Miller, E.)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Tue 05/14 1:02 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Sharon S. Almonrode on behalf of plaintiffs Michael Laukka, Heidi Wettberg (Almonrode, Sharon)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Tue 05/14 1:03 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Christopher D. Kaye on behalf of plaintiffs Michael Laukka, Heidi Wettberg (Kaye, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
3 3 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Mon 05/13 9:24 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Paul L. Maloney (mg)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Mon 05/13 3:14 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Donald R. Visser on behalf of plaintiffs Michael Laukka, Heidi Wettberg (Visser, Donald)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Mon 05/13 3:14 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Daniel O. Myers on behalf of plaintiffs Michael Laukka, Heidi Wettberg (Myers, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 05/10 10:36 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ontonagon County Circuit case number 24-000018-CZ filed by Michele Smith, Ontonagon County (Lawler, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 05/10 10:50 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Magy Shenouda on behalf of defendants Ontonagon County, Michele Smith (Shenouda, Magy)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Fri 05/10 10:54 AM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by defendants Ontonagon County, Michele Smith in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7371077 (Shenouda, Magy)
Related: [-]