Consolidated
Lead case: 0:15-md-02666

Minnesota District Court
Judge:Joan N Ericksen
Referred: David T Schultz
Case #: 0:24-cv-01696
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332-pip-Diversity-Personal Injury, Product Liability
Case Filed:May 10, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 06, 2024 3:15 AM CST
Defendant
3M Company
Represented By
Benjamin W. Hulse
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Arizant Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By
Benjamin W. Hulse
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dennis Hiner
Represented By
Gabriel Assaad
Mcdonald Worley
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 13, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/13 12:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W. Hulse on behalf of All Defendants. (Hulse, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel to Comply with Pretrial Orders in Main MDL Case Fri 05/10 11:20 AM
(Text-Only) COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file IN RE: Bair Hugger Forced Air Warming Devices Products Liability Litigation 0:15-md-02666-JNE-DTS . Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:15-md-02666-JNE-DTS . (ABR)
Related: [-]
4 4 order MDL Pretrial Order Fri 05/10 11:19 AM
MDL PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1: Establishing Procedures. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 1/13/2016.(ABR)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 05/10 11:18 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. (ABR)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Fri 05/10 11:17 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 24-cv-1696 (JNE/DTS). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/10 10:55 AM
COMPLAINT Dennis Hiner against All Defendants (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11042396) filed by Dennis Hiner. Filer requests summons issued. (Assaad, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet