California Northern District Court
Judge:Joseph C Spero
Case #: 3:24-cv-02809
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:May 10, 2024
Case in other court:San Francisco County Superior Court, CGC-24-613809
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 06, 2024 1:11 AM PST
Defendant
Eli Lilly and Company
Represented By
Kevin P Lee
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Janelle Jad Sahouria
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Brett Roberts
Represented By
Kevin P Lee
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Janelle Jad Sahouria
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Jill Scott
Represented By
Kevin P Lee
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Janelle Jad Sahouria
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Tanya Hosseinyoun
Represented By
Camron Dowlatshahi
Mills Sadat Dowlat LLP
contact info
Brigitte Mills
Mills Sandat Dowlatt LLP
contact info
Arash Sadat
Mills Sadat Dowlat LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
32 32 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 03/18 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Entire Case by Tanya Hosseinyoun (Sadat, Arash)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
31 31 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Tue 02/25 10:39 AM
CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MGMT CONFERENCE AND SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2025 is continued to 5/7/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Case management statement due 4/30/2025. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
30 30 misc Case Management Statement Mon 02/24 4:22 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eli Lilly and Company. (Lee, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
29 29 minutes Case Management Conference - Further ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Thu 12/05 9:42 AM
AMENDED Minute Entry for ZOOM proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/4/2024. Case Management Statement due by 2/26/2025. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at jcscrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 3/3/2025 by 3:00 PM. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Digital Recording Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Kyle Aronson. Attorney for Defendant: Kevin Lee. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/5/2024)
Related: [-]
28 28 minutes Case Management Conference - Further ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Thu 12/05 9:31 AM
* PLEASE DISREGARD. INCORRECT DATES. See next entry* Minute Entry for ZOOM proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/4/2024. Case Management Statement due by 4/2/2025. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A joint list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at jcscrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 4/7/2025 by 3:00 PM. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Digital Recording Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Kyle Aronson. Attorney for Defendant: Kevin Lee. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/5/2024) Modified on 12/5/2024 (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 12/05 9:42 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:28 Case Management Conference - Further.Please disregard due to incorrect dates. See Amended Civil Minute Order29 for corrected dates. (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
27 27 misc Joint Case Management Statement Wed 11/27 1:10 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Further Case Management Statement filed by Eli Lilly and Company. (Lee, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
26 26 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 11/12 4:42 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Jill Scott, Brett Roberts (Lee, Kevin)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 11/12 4:40 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Jill Scott, Brett Roberts (Lee, Kevin)
Related: [-]
24 24 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/12 1:42 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Jill Scott, Brett Roberts. (Lee, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
23 23 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Fri 09/20 4:12 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eli Lilly and Company.. (Sahouria, Janelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
22 22 minutes Case Management Conference - Further ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Thu 09/19 9:57 AM
Minute Entry for ZOOM proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/18/2024. Consent/Declination as to Defendants Jill Scott and Brett Roberts due by 9/20/2024. Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2024. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2025 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Close of Fact Discovery due by 4/30/2025. Designation of Experts due by 5/1/2025. Rebuttal Reports due by 5/15/2025. Close of Expert Discovery due by 6/2/2025. Dispositive Motions & Daubert due by 6/11/2025. Responses/Oppositions due by 6/25/2025. Replies due by 7/2/2025. Dispositve Motion & Daubert Hearing set for 7/30/2025 09:30 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Digital Recording Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Camron Dowlatshahi. Attorney for Defendant: Janelle Sahouria, Kevin Lee. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/19/2024)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
21 21 misc Joint Case Management Statement Wed 09/11 5:14 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eli Lilly and Company. (Sahouria, Janelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
20 20 misc Statement Wed 08/21 4:55 PM
Statement in Compliance with Court's August 15, 2024 Minute Order [Joint] by Eli Lilly and Company. (Sahouria, Janelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
19 19 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 08/19 5:28 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tanya Hosseinyoun.. (Sadat, Arash)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
18 18 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Thu 08/15 8:27 AM
Minute Entry for ZOOM proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/14/2024.Plaintiff orally Consents to Proceed before the United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2024. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Digital Recording Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Camron Dowlatshahi. Attorney for Defendant: Janelle Sahouria, Kevin Lee. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/15/2024)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
17 17 misc Joint Case Management Statement Fri 08/09 3:17 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eli Lilly and Company. (Sahouria, Janelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
16 16 misc Case Management Statement Wed 08/07 6:59 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eli Lilly and Company. (Sahouria, Janelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
15 15 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Mon 08/05 1:55 PM
CLERK'S FOURTH NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Hosseinyoun shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 8/19/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
14 14 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 08/01 2:51 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lee, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
13 13 adr ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance after 5/1/2018 Thu 07/25 10:50 AM
ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Mon 07/15 10:04 AM
CLERK'S THIRD NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Hosseinyoun shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
11 11 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 07/02 3:47 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eli Lilly and Company.. (Lee, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 06/18 2:00 PM
CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 7/2/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Thu 06/13 1:59 PM
CLERKS NOTICE RE DATE CHANGE AND SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Effective July 1, 2024, Judge Spero's Law and Motion calendar will be held on Wednesdays. Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2024 is moved to 8/14/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 05/31 1:53 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 6/14/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
7 7 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 05/10 4:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eli Lilly and Company re4 Certificate of Service [AMENDED] (Lee, Kevin)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 05/10 1:26 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 05/10 11:23 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/24/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 05/10 11:12 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eli Lilly and Company re3 Certificate of Interested Entities,2 Certificate of Interested Entities,1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Sahouria, Janelle)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 05/10 11:09 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eli Lilly and Company (Sahouria, Janelle)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 05/10 11:08 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Eli Lilly and Company (Sahouria, Janelle)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 05/10 11:07 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior. Their case number is CGC-24-613809. Copy of Complaint and Answer attached. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19403587). Filed by Eli Lilly and Company.(Sahouria, Janelle) Modified on 5/10/2024 (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 05/10 1:38 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . The following errors have been corrected on the case opening screen : (1) The Origin Code is corrected to '2 - Removal from State Court'. (2) The County Code is corrected to 'Marin' and not San Francisco as it refers to plaintiff's county of residence. (3) The party type for Tanya Hosseinyoun is plaintiff, not defendant. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by Eli Lilly and Company. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 05/10 1:41 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Attorney Camron Dowlatshahi has been entered on the docket but the docket shows that the attorney is with the law firm of Loeb & Loeb LLP. Attorney Camron Dowlatshahi needs to update the ECF account as soon as possible. Re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by Eli Lilly and Company. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]