Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Dee D Drell
Referred: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Case #: 1:24-cv-00612
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:May 10, 2024
Case in other court:10th JDC Natchitoches Parish, C-945517
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 06, 2024 3:13 AM CST
Defendant
Mussie Mulugeta Birru
Represented By
Guy D Perrier
Perrier & Lacoste
contact info
Kristopher Michael Gould
Perrier & Lacoste
contact info
Defendant
N C Transportation L L C
Represented By
Guy D Perrier
Perrier & Lacoste
contact info
Kristopher Michael Gould
Perrier & Lacoste
contact info
Defendant
North River Insurance Co
Represented By
Guy D Perrier
Perrier & Lacoste
contact info
Kristopher Michael Gould
Perrier & Lacoste
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Braxton
Represented By
Otis Edwin Dunahoe
Dunahoe Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
24 24 order Order Fri 05/09 11:10 AM
90-DAY TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ORDER.(crt,Muncey, E)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 90-Day Conference Notice
23 23 order Minute Entry ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 05/09 9:12 AM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A Status Conference (90 day conference) is set for 06/25/2025 at 2:00 p.m. by video conference before the undersigned. A separate email will be sent to counsel of record the day prior to the hearing. Only attorneys enrolled as counsel of record and parties representing themselves, may participate in the conference. A 90-Day Telephone Conference Order and Notice will be issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 5/9/2025. (crt,Tice, Y)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
22 22 order Minute Entry 1 - Terminate Hearings Mon 03/24 9:27 AM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: The Status Conference currently set for 03/26/2024 is hereby CANCELLED as the Plaintiff has not retained counsel and notice has been filed as Ordered in doc.20 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 3/24/2025. (crt,Tice, Y)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 01/16 2:28 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Otis Edwin Dunahoe terminated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Michael Braxton be granted 60 days to secure new counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/16/2025. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order Mon 01/13 4:21 PM
90-DAY TELEPHONE CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 1/13/2025.(crt,Tice, Y)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
19 19 order Minute Entry ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 01/13 4:20 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A Status Conference (90 day conference) is set for 3/26/2025 at 3:00 p.m. by video conference before the undersigned. A separate email will be sent to counsel of record the day prior to the hearing. Only attorneys enrolled as counsel of record and parties representing themselves, may participate in the conference. A 90-Day Telephone Conference Order and Notice will be issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 1/13/2025. (crt,Tice, Y)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 01/13 11:21 AM
MOTION to Withdraw Otis Edwin Dunahoe as Attorney by Michael Braxton. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/13/2025. (aty,Dunahoe, Otis) Modified to reflect proposed order submitted within main document on 1/13/2025 (Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
17 17 order Case Management Order - Judges Drell, Doughty, James Mon 08/05 1:27 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 2 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D. Drell sent to counsel of record. (crt,Tice, Y)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Plan of Work Mon 08/05 1:26 PM
PLAN OF WORK filed by All Parties. Discovery deadline 5/1/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 12/1/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2024. Final Date for Expert Employment 1/2/2025. Exchange of Expert Reports due by 3/1/2025. Expert Depositions due by 5/1/2025. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 9/1/2025.(crt,Tice, Y)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Proposed Plan of Work Mon 08/05 1:23 PM
ORDER granting12 Proposed Plan of Work. A Pretrial Conference is set for 1/15/2026 at 2:15 PM, in chambers, before Judge Dee D. Drell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 8/5/2024. (crt,Tice, Y)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
14 14 order Minute Entry 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 08/02 3:59 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: The Status Conference currently set for 08/06/2024 is cancelled as the plan of work will be approved. An Order to follow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 8/2/2024. (crt,Tice, Y)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
13 13 order Minute Entry ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 07/10 11:28 AM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A Status Conference is set for 08/06/2024 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes. All attendance at this hearing will be by video conference. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss the proposed Plan of Work, pretrial procedures, anticipated discovery issues, dispositive motions, and settlement prospects. An email with the link access will be sent the day prior to the hearing. Participants are reminded of requirements of our local rules with respect to proper attire in the courtroom. They are to abide by those requirements even when participating via teleconference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 7/10/2024. (crt,Tice, Y)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
12 12 motion Proposed Plan of Work Tue 07/09 3:33 PM
Joint PROPOSED Plan of Work by Michael Braxton. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/9/2024. (aty,Dunahoe, Otis)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/24 9:15 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by N C Transportation L L C. (aty,Gould, Kristopher)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/24 9:13 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by North River Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Crum & Forster Holdings Corp., Corporate Parent Fairfax (US) Inc., Corporate Parent FFHL Group Ltd., Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited for North River Insurance Co. (aty,Gould, Kristopher)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Fri 05/24 9:00 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by North River Insurance Co. (aty,Gould, Kristopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
8 8 misc Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Tue 05/14 11:37 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Michael Braxton. (aty,Dunahoe, Otis)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Case Management Order - Judges Drell, Doughty, James ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 05/14 10:36 AM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 7/9/2024.)(crt,Roaix, G)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
6 6 order Removal Order Mon 05/13 2:59 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 5/13/2024. (crt,Tice, Y)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Fri 05/10 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Otis Edwin Dunahoe on behalf of Michael Braxton. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 5/24/2024. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Fri 05/10 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Kristopher Michael Gould on behalf of Mussie Mulugeta Birru, N C Transportation L L C, North River Insurance Co. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 5/24/2024. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included) Fri 05/10 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Kristopher Michael Gould on behalf of N C Transportation L L C, North River Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/24/2024. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) Fri 05/10 2:12 PM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/10/2024. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 05/10 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Removal from 10th JDC Natchitoches Parish, Case Number C-945517 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5940790) filed by The North River Insurance Co.(Attorney Kristopher Michael Gould added to party The North River Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Gould, Kristopher) Modified docket text on 5/10/2024 (Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 List of Parties,
Att: 3 List of Pleadings,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 - RFA Responses
service State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases) Fri 05/10 1:49 PM
STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. North River Insurance Co answer due 5/17/2024. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #4 to Document #1, Notice of Removal. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/10 1:52 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand ( 10th JDC Natchitoches Parish, #94551, filed 4/2/2024) by North River Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found in Attachment #4 to Document #1, Notice of Removal. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/10 2:02 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Whitener, M)
Related: [-]