New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vernon S Broderick
Case #: 1:24-cv-03625
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201dj Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:May 10, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 06, 2024 4:24 AM EST
Counter Claimant
James Gang Charters, LLC
Represented By
Matthew David Dunn
Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP
contact info
Gary Douglas Sesser
Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Jesse Mayer
Represented By
Matthew David Dunn
Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP
contact info
Gary Douglas Sesser
Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
National Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
James Edward Mercante
Gallo Vitucci Klar LLP
contact info
Richard Gonzalez
Rubin Fiorella And Friedman LLP
contact info
Defendant
James Gang Charters, LLC
Represented By
Matthew David Dunn
Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP
contact info
Gary Douglas Sesser
Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jesse Mayer
Represented By
Matthew David Dunn
Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP
contact info
Gary Douglas Sesser
Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
National Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
James Edward Mercante
Gallo Vitucci Klar LLP
contact info
Richard Gonzalez
Rubin Fiorella And Friedman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
30 30 misc Letter Fri 05/16 3:21 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Matthew D. Dunn dated May 16, 2025 re: Continuation of Stay. Document filed by James Gang Charters, LLC, Jesse Mayer..(Dunn, Matthew)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Case Stay Lifted Fri 05/16 11:16 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:28 Letter filed by National Specialty Insurance Company. ENDORSEMENT: The stay of this case is hereby LIFTED. The parties are directed to meet and confer regarding a summary judgment briefing schedule. The parties are directed to submit a joint letter proposing a briefing schedule to the court by June 11, 2025. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/16/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
28 28 misc Letter Thu 05/15 2:59 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from James E. Mercante dated May 15, 2025 re: Declaratory Judgment action. Document filed by National Specialty Insurance Company..(Mercante, James)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/15 2:27 PM
FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - MOTION for Anthony J. Cuva to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-31087966. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by James Gang Charters, LLC, Jesse Mayer..(Cuva, Anthony) Modified on 5/15/2025 (bc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit and Certificate,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order
misc Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/15 3:20 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 27 MOTION for Anthony J. Cuva to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-31087966. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida, not state bar. Judges Initials are incorrect on documents;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Mon 04/07 3:14 PM
ORDER On October 9, 2024, I entered an order staying the above-captioned case pending the outcome of the appeal of Jesse Mayer's criminal conviction in Florida, which involves the same underlying incident as this case. (Doc. 24.) In accordance with that stay, the telephonic conference scheduled for April 15, 2025 at 2:00 pm is hereby ADJOURNED sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/7/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
25 25 misc Letter Mon 03/10 1:07 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from :James E. Mercante, and Gary D. Sesser dated March 7, 2025 re: status of the pending case. Document filed by National Specialty Insurance Company..(Mercante, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 10/09 11:17 AM
ORDER granting21 Letter Motion to Stay. It is hereby: ORDERED that this action is stayed, and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint letter noting the status of Defendant Mayer's criminal appeal on March 10, 2025, and every 90 days thereafter. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/9/2024) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
23 23 misc Letter Mon 10/07 3:03 PM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from James E. Mercante dated 10/05/2024 re: Response to Letter Motion to Stay. Document filed by National Specialty Insurance Company..(Mercante, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
22 22 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 09/26 10:27 AM
ORDER with respect to21 Letter Motion to Stay. By October 10, 2024, Plaintiff is directed to respond to Defendants' request for a stay. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/26/2024) (sgz)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 09/26 10:28 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to21 LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Gary D. Sesser dated September 24, 2024.. Responses due by 10/10/2024 (sgz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
21 21 motion Stay Tue 09/24 2:35 PM
LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Gary D. Sesser dated September 24, 2024. Document filed by James Gang Charters, LLC, Jesse Mayer..(Sesser, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
20 20 order Case Management Plan Fri 09/20 10:58 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §636(c). The issue of whether the Defendants/Counter-claimants are entitled to a jury on the counterclaims is a legal issue to be decided by the Court. The Court will conduct a telephonic post-discovery conference on April 15, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. The dial-in number is 888-363-4749 and the conference code is 2682448. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is Three (3) days. Depositions shall be completed by January 20, 2025. Expert Deposition due by 3/20/2025. Fact Discovery due by 1/20/2025. Expert Discovery due by 3/20/2025. Discovery due by 3/20/2025. Telephone Conference set for 4/15/2025 at 02:00 PM before Judge Vernon S. Broderick. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/19/2024) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
19 19 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Tue 09/17 3:47 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by National Specialty Insurance Company..(Gonzalez, Richard)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Letter Tue 09/17 3:40 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Richard Gonzalez and Gary D. Sesser dated September 17, 2024 re: per Order [Dkt. 17]. Document filed by National Specialty Insurance Company..(Gonzalez, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 09/12 9:39 AM
ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that the Court will not be holding an initial pretrial conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by September 18, 2024, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed three (3) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs: as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/11/2024) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
16 16 respoth Reply (non-motion) Tue 09/10 3:05 PM
REPLY re:14 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, (Plaintiff's Response to Counterclaims) . Document filed by National Specialty Insurance Company..(Mercante, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 09/04 4:03 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that Plaintiff shall respond to the counterclaim by September 10, 2024. SO ORDERED. National Specialty Insurance Company answer due 9/10/2024. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/4/2024) (sgz)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 08/12 12:08 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against National Specialty Insurance Company. Document filed by Jesse Mayer, James Gang Charters, LLC..(Sesser, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Claim of Brittney Kelling,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Claims of Kathleen Krysztofowicz individually and as personal representative of the estate of Robert Krysztofowicz Jr.,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Answer Affirmative Defenses and Claims of Mark Nowak
13 13 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/12 12:02 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by James Gang Charters, LLC, Jesse Mayer..(Sesser, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/09 11:24 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew David Dunn on behalf of James Gang Charters, LLC, Jesse Mayer..(Dunn, Matthew)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/09 11:06 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary Douglas Sesser on behalf of James Gang Charters, LLC, Jesse Mayer..(Sesser, Gary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 07/30 4:41 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. James Gang Charters, LLC served on 7/22/2024, answer due 8/12/2024; Jesse Mayer served on 7/22/2024, answer due 8/12/2024. Service was accepted by Sarah Mayer. Document filed by National Specialty Insurance Company..(Gonzalez, Richard)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Other Tue 07/30 4:27 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint for Declaratory Judgment served on Mr. James Mayer, James Gang Charters on July 26, 2024. Service was accepted by Mr. Jesse Mayer, James Gang Charters, LLC, at Bay Correctional Facility, 5400 Bayline Drive, Panama City, Fl 32404-5492. Document filed by National Specialty Insurance Company..(Gonzalez, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued Mon 05/13 3:51 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jesse Mayer..(pc)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 05/13 3:50 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jesse Mayer..(pc)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 05/13 2:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mercante, James)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 05/13 11:33 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 05/13 11:34 AM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 05/13 11:34 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 05/13 11:34 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard Gonzalez. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Mon 05/13 11:34 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Richard Gonzalez to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; civil cover sheet was not signed, office was not selected. Incorrect citizenship for first listed defendant was selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/10 3:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Gonzalez on behalf of National Specialty Insurance Company..(Gonzalez, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 05/10 3:34 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mr. Jesse Mayer, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by National Specialty Insurance Company..(Mercante, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 05/10 3:32 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mr. Jesse Mayer, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by National Specialty Insurance Company..(Mercante, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 05/10 3:27 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mercante, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/10 3:20 PM
COMPLAINT against James Gang Charters, LLC, Jesse Mayer. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29340032)Document filed by National Specialty Insurance Company..(Mercante, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - AMES GANG CHARTERS LLC - Corporations Search.,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Policy Declaration Endorsement,
Att: 3 Exhibit C.- FL Fish Wildlife Cons Comm - Boating_Accident Repor,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - COMPLAINT - ARREST AFFIDAVI,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Initial ROR Letter,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Amended ROR Letter,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Case No. 19-10939 CF,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Renewed ROR Letter