California Central District Court
Judge:Anne Hwang
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:24-cv-03929
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:May 10, 2024
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 23CHCV03597
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 06, 2024 1:17 AM PST
Defendant
Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Represented By
Leila S Nourani
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Scott Matthew Nenni
Jackson Lewis, PC
contact info
Leila Nourani
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Sherry S Hamilton
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Chloe Maya Wigul
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Tyesha McKeever
Represented By
Aidin D Ghavimi
Starpoint Lc
contact info
Ilana Natalie Fine
Starpoint, Lc
contact info


Docket last updated: 17 minutes ago
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
18 18 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 01/15 3:44 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Anne Hwang. NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES. On the Court's own motion, the Pretrial Conference currently set for August 18, 2025, is hereby continued to AUGUST 20, 2025 at 1:30 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ys)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
17 17 17 pgs order Order Wed 12/18 10:47 AM
STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Anne Hwang. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
16 16 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Mon 12/09 3:07 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#202) approved by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Anne Hwang, this case is transferred from Judge Otis D. Wright, II to the calendar of Judge Anne Hwang for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-03929-AH (JPRx). (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
15 15 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Mon 07/29 11:12 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings Tue 07/23 4:50 PM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (JURY TRIAL) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: This Order is to advise the parties and counsel of the schedule that will govern this case. THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2025 01:30 PM. Jury Trial set for 9/16/2025 09:00 AM. Motion in Limine set for hearing on 9/8/2025 at 01:30 PM. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES) (rolm)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
13 13 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 07/22 3:44 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Tyesha McKeever.. (Ghavimi, Aidin)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 07/22 1:44 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sherry S Hamilton counsel for Defendant Cardinal Health 110, LLC. Adding Sherry S. Hamilton as counsel of record for Cardinal Health 110, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Cardinal Health 110, LLC. (Attorney Sherry S Hamilton added to party Cardinal Health 110, LLC(pty:dft))(Hamilton, Sherry)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
11 11 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 05/13 11:03 AM
ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for July 29, 2024 at 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action (lc)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 05/13 10:45 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY- No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR Motions for summary judgment and any other evidence-heavy motions. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
9 9 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Fri 05/10 4:32 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Notice of Removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 05/10 3:36 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 05/10 3:36 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 05/10 3:35 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/10 2:30 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant CARDINAL HEALTH 110, LLC (Nenni, Scott)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Declaration Fri 05/10 2:29 PM
DECLARATION of LAURA GARZA re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant CARDINAL HEALTH 110, LLC. (Nenni, Scott)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 05/10 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CARDINAL HEALTH 110, LLC, (Nenni, Scott)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration Fri 05/10 2:00 PM
DECLARATION of SCOTT M. NENNI re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant CARDINAL HEALTH 110, LLC.(Nenni, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 05/10 1:45 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 23CHCV03597 with filing fee previously paid ($405.00 paid on 05/10/2024, receipt number ACACDC-37448742), filed by Defendant CARDINAL HEALTH 110, LLC. (Attorney Scott Matthew Nenni added to party CARDINAL HEALTH 110, LLC(pty:dft))(Nenni, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 05/10 4:13 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Does 1 through 100, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Tyesha McKeever. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/28/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO DECLARATION OF SCOTT M. NENNI) (ghap)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Fri 05/10 4:16 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Cardinal Health 110, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/5/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT G TO DECLARATION OF SCOTT M. NENNI)(ghap)
Related: [-]