Maryland District Court
Judge:Deborah K Chasanow
Referred: Timothy J Sullivan
Case #: 8:24-cv-01385
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:May 10, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 06, 2024 4:19 AM EST
Defendant
Wheelz Up Garage, Inc.
5352 Beech Road Suite 24
Temple Hill, MD 20748
Represented By
Philip James George
Greenbergtraurig, LLP
contact info
David Glenn Barger
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
James C. Evans
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Defendant
Wheelz Up, LLC
5325 Beech Road Suite 24
Temple Hills, MD 20748
Represented By
Philip James George
Greenbergtraurig, LLP
contact info
David Glenn Barger
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
James C. Evans
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Defendant
Adrianne Harold Cordero
5155 Lindell Rd. Apt. 1003
Las Vegas, NV 89118
Movant
John Avenido
Represented By
Kevin Ashley Cline
Arnold And Porter LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LPUSA, LLC
1165 Sanctuary Parkway Suite 90
Alpharetta, GA 30009
Represented By
Matthew Owen Gatewood
Gatewood PLLC
contact info
Jason S McCarter
Miller & Martin PLLC
contact info
Clayton A. Smith
Miller & Martin PLLC
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Adrianne Harold Cordero
5155 Lindell Rd. Apt. 1003
Las Vegas, NV 89118
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Wheelz Up Garage, Inc.
Represented By
Philip James George
Greenbergtraurig, LLP
contact info
David Glenn Barger
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Wheelz Up, LLC
Represented By
Philip James George
Greenbergtraurig, LLP
contact info
David Glenn Barger
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info

GPO Sep 20 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/20/2024. (sat, Chambers)
GPO Nov 26 2024
LETTER OPINION AND ORDER denying non-party John Daryl Avenido's 41 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 11/26/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
71 71 minutes Settlement Conference Wed 04/23 8:18 PM
Settlement Conference held on 4/23/2025 before Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi. (Quereshi, Ajmel)
Related: [-]
70 70 order Settlement Order Wed 04/23 4:50 PM
ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated within 45 days. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 4/23/2025. (sat, Chambers)
Related: [-]