Washington Western District Court
Judge:James L Robart
Case #: 2:24-cv-00657
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity
Case Filed:May 10, 2024
Terminated:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 06, 2024 1:36 AM PST
Defendant
AIG WarrantyGuard Inc
Represented By
David B Carpenter
Alston & Bird Llp (ga)
contact info
Adam J Kaiser
Alston & Bird (ny)
contact info
Rachel E K Lowe
Alston & Bird (ca)
contact info
Donald J Verfurth
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani Llp (seattle)
contact info
Defendant
Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By
Galen D Bellamy
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
contact info
Emily J Harris
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Kristin E Bateman
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Andrew Unthank
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
contact info
Riley Collins
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Hadassah Shellenberger
Represented By
Gregory W Albert
Albert Law PLLC
contact info
Tallman Harlow Trask, IV
Albert Law PLLC
contact info
Evan E Sumer
The Law Office Of Evan Sumer
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
63 63 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Thu 05/08 10:01 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Tallman Harlow Trask, IV for Plaintiff Hadassah Shellenberger. (Trask, Tallman)
Related: [-]