South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-02935
Nature of Suit385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 09, 2024
Terminated:Sep 27, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 05, 2024 3:57 AM EST
Defendant
Dude Products Inc.
Represented By
Paul Olszowka
Barnes And Thornburg (chi Il)
contact info
Christine E. Skoczylas
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Chad Stover
Barnes And Thornburg (wilm De)
contact info
Plaintiff
Commissioner of Public Works of The City of Charleston
Represented By
Frank Paul Calamita, III
Aqualaw
contact info
Francis P. Karam
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Vincent M. Serra
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, September 27, 2024
27 27 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Fri 09/27 11:24 AM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion for final approval of class action settlement and an award of attorneys' fees. (Dkt. No. 21). The Parties are ORDERED to continue to effectuate the Settlement Agreements in accordance with their terms. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 9/27/24.(ltap, )
Related: [-]
26 26 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 09/27 10:41 AM
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Richard M Gergel: Settlement Hearing held on 9/27/2024 by telephone. All parties are represented on the call. Court to issue written order. Court Reporter Beth Krupa. (cper, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
25 25 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 09/26 9:56 AM
TEXT ORDER: For good cause shown, Defendant's motion that local counsel be excused from attending the final settlement hearing in this matter (Dkt. No. 24) is granted. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 9/26/24.(ltap, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
24 24 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 09/24 3:58 PM
Consent MOTION to Excuse Presence of Local Counsel re 23 Notice Other, by Dude Products Inc.. Response to Motion due by 10/8/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Stover, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
23 23 notice Notice Other Tue 09/24 11:13 AM
NOTICE re 18 Notice of Settlement Hearing: Due to the uncertainty of the weather in the Lowcountry Region on Friday, this hearing will now be held on 9/27/2024 at 10:00 via TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. The Court will provide call-in instructions. (ltap, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
22 22 respm Response in Support of Motion Fri 09/20 8:25 AM
RESPONSE in Support re21 MOTION for Settlement (for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses (Reply Memorandum in Further Support) Response filed by Commissioner of Public Works of The City of Charleston. (Calamita, Frank)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
21 21 motion Settlement Fri 08/23 10:01 AM
MOTION for Settlement (for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses by Commissioner of Public Works of The City of Charleston. Response to Motion due by 9/6/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, #2 Memo in Support of (1) Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; and (2) Class Counsel's Application for Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses, #3 Joint Declaration in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and an Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses, #4 Declaration of Vincent M. Serra in Support of Motion to Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses, #5 Declaration of F. Paul Calamita in Support of Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses, #6 Declaration of Mark Cline in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and an Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses, #7 Declaration of Ross D. Murray regarding Notice Dissemination and Publication, #8 Declaration of F. Paul Calamita regarding Notice Dissemination and Publication)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Calamita, Frank)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
19 19 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/18 2:57 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 17 Motion of Paul Olszowka to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dude Products Inc. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/18/2024.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 06/18 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Hearing set for 9/27/2024 10:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. (ltap, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion) Wed 06/12 4:16 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul Olszowka ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11820900) by Dude Products Inc.. Response to Motion due by 6/26/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Stover, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Application and Affidavit for Pro hac Admission,
Att: 3 Certificate of Admission / Good Standing
16 16 order Scheduling Order Wed 06/12 11:27 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER See Order for Event and Schedule. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/12/2024. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
15 15 misc Letter Thu 06/06 12:25 PM
Letter from Settling Parties - Proposed Timeline for Proposed Settlement. (Calamita, Frank)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
14 14 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Fri 05/31 12:13 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion for preliminarysettlement approval (Dkt. No. 5). Within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order, the Parties shall file a Proposed Timeline for Proposed Settlement for the Courts consideration. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/31/24.(ltap, )
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/31 11:08 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Christine E. Skoczylas for Dude Products Inc. Entered at the direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 05/31/2024.(hcor, )
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/31 11:05 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Francis P. Karam for Commissioner of Public Works of The City of Charleston. Entered at the direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 05/31/2024.(hcor, )
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/31 11:02 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Vincent M. Serra for Commissioner of Public Works of The City of Charleston. Entered at the direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 05/31/2024.(hcor, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion) Thu 05/30 3:11 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christine E. Skoczylas ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11796005) by Dude Products Inc.. Response to Motion due by 6/13/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Stover, Chad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Application and Affidavit for Pro hac Admission,
Att: 3 Certificate of Admission / Good Standing
9 9 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 05/30 3:03 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Dude Products Inc..(Stover, Chad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/22 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Stover on behalf of Dude Products Inc. (Stover, Chad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion) Wed 05/15 4:11 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Francis P. Karam ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11767015) by Commissioner of Public Works of The City of Charleston. Response to Motion due by 5/29/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Calamita, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion) Wed 05/15 4:07 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Vincent M. Serra ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number ASCDC-11766943) by Commissioner of Public Works of The City of Charleston. Response to Motion due by 5/29/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Calamita, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, May 10, 2024
5 5 motion Settlement Fri 05/10 3:50 PM
MOTION for Settlement by Commissioner of Public Works of The City of Charleston. Response to Motion due by 5/24/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Calamita, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement,
Att: 2 Supporting Documents Stipulation of Settlement
Thursday, May 09, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 05/10 11:25 AM
Summons Issued as to Dude Products Inc.. (hcor, )
Related: [-]
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 05/10 11:25 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Commissioner of Public Works of The City of Charleston.(hcor, )
Related: [-]
1 1 35 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/10 11:23 AM
COMPLAINT against Dude Products Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11755117.), filed by Commissioner of Public Works of The City of Charleston. Service due by 8/7/2024(hcor, )
Related: [-]