Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-03299
Case Filed:May 08, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 11, 2024 1:00 AM MST
Defendant
Erick Jaziel Hernandez-Rosas (1)
Represented By
Christopher Robert Kilburn
Kilburn Law Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jose Ruben Solis, Jr.
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2024 3:13 AM MST
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
Arrest of Erick Jaziel Hernandez-Rosas on 5/7/2024. (CAB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Erick Jaziel Hernandez-Rosas. (CAB)
Related: [-]