Illinois Southern District Court
Judge:Reona J Daly
Case #: 3:24-cv-01263
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:May 13, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 09, 2024 4:07 AM CST
Defendant
DG Retail, LLC
Represented By
Melissa Mitchell Pesce
Ogletree, Deakins, Et Al - St. Louis
contact info
Plaintiff
Contessa Washington
637 W. Highway 50
O'Fallon, IL 62269
Represented By
Angie Marie Zinzilieta
Wendler & Zinzilieta PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
20 20 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 05/12 11:07 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly: Status Conference held on 5/12/2025. The parties shall file a status report regarding their arbitration proceeding on 10/1/2025. (lmo)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
19 19 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 04/25 3:46 PM
ORDER: Status conference set for 5/12/2025 at 10:30 AM via telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. To join the conference, counsel should call 571-353-2301. The access code is 090647147. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 4/25/2025. (lmo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
18 18 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 08/08 8:51 AM
ORDER GRANTING17 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by DG Retail, LLC. The status conference set for today, as well as the final pretrial conference and jury trial set for July and August 2025 Related [+], are VACATED. Parties to file a joint status report on or before 2/8/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 8/8/2024. (lmo)
Related: [-] specitively
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
17 17 motion Stay Wed 08/07 1:20 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration by DG Retail, LLC. (Pesce, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Wed 07/03 8:19 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 7/3/2024. (jlm)
Related: [-]
15 15 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 07/03 8:18 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 8/8/2024 at 10:00 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. To join the conference call, the parties should call 888-273-3658. The access code is 1770924. The security code is 1263. The parties are to submit a Joint Report and Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order seven days before the conference via e-mail to RJDpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 7/3/2024. (jlm)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice CJRA Track Wed 07/03 8:16 AM
CJRA TRACK B assigned. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2025 at 9:30 AM in Benton Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. Jury Trial set for 8/12/2025 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. (jlm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
13 13 notice Notice Upon Consent to Trial by Magistrate Thu 06/27 9:17 AM
NOTICE: All parties have consented to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly is ASSIGNED to conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. All future documents must bear case number 24-1263 RJD. Any District Judge previously assigned will no longer be assigned to this case. (tkm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
12 12 misc Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge Wed 06/26 2:43 PM
CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Pesce, Melissa)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice Extending Consent Deadline Wed 06/26 1:45 PM
NOTICE: DG Retail, Inc. was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 386, DG Retail, Inc. shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. Consent due by 7/3/2024 (tkm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
10 10 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 06/04 3:53 PM
ORDER GRANTING9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time. Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 7/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 6/4/2024. (lmo)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 06/04 10:56 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint or Other Responsive Pleading by DG Retail, LLC. (Pesce, Melissa)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice Requesting Consent Tue 06/04 8:33 AM
NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing DG Retail, Inc. to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience:[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/sites/ilsd/files/BenefitsofConsent.pdf] . Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to DG Retail, Inc. on 6/4/2024. Consent due by 6/25/2024 (tkm)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/03 8:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Mitchell Pesce on behalf of All Defendants (Pesce, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/20 2:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Contessa Washington. DG Retail, LLC served on 5/16/2024, answer due 6/6/2024. (Wendler, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
5 5 misc Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge Wed 05/15 10:31 AM
CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Zinzilieta, Angie)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 05/13 10:56 AM
Summons Issued as to DG Retail, LLC, d/b/a Dollar General. Original summons mailed to Attorney Zinzilieta. (tkm)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Initial Magistrate Assignment Mon 05/13 10:50 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Orders 347 and 367. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or non-consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Contessa Washington. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience:[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/sites/ilsd/files/BenefitsofConsent.pdf] . All future documents must bear case number 24-1263 RJD. Consent due by 6/3/2024 (tkm)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 05/13 10:26 AM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Contessa Washington. (Zinzilieta, Angie)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/13 10:25 AM
COMPLAINT against DG Retail, LLC, d/b/a Dollar General, filed by Contessa Washington.(Zinzilieta, Angie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons Summons