Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Craig M Straw
Case #: 2:24-cv-02035
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 13, 2024
Case in other court:Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, 240401796
Last checked: Saturday Nov 09, 2024 5:31 AM EST
Defendant
MTD PRODUCTS, INC
5903 Grafton Road
Valley City, OH 44280
Represented By
FREDERICK W. BODE, III
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote PC
contact info
Richard T. Coyne
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote
contact info
MICHAEL A. MUHA
Dickie, Mccamey &chilcote, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
STANLEY BLACK & DECKER, INC.
1000 Stanley Drive
New Britain, CT 06053
Represented By
FREDERICK W. BODE, III
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote PC
contact info
Richard T. Coyne
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote
contact info
MICHAEL A. MUHA
Dickie, Mccamey &chilcote, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
JARON GEORGE
120 East Saint Marys Road
Hanover Township, PA 18706
Represented By
STEVEN JOSEPH PAYNE
Steven Payne, Esquire
contact info
Plaintiff
RACHEL E. GEORGE
120 East Saint Marys Road
Hanover Township, PA 18076
Represented By
STEVEN JOSEPH PAYNE
Steven Payne, Esquire
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
27 27 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/24 2:50 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 12/16/25 AT 10:00 AM IN ROOM 3029 BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW. ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 6/20/25. JURY SELECTION SET FOR 1/9/26 AT 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM 3G BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW. ALL DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 8/4/25. MOTIONS IN LIMINE ARE DUE BY 10/17/25. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/21/25. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/21/25. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 1/12/26 AT 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM 3G BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW ON 4/24/25. 4/24/25 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
26 26 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Thu 04/24 2:42 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW. Re: A Pretrial Conference was held on 4/22/25. (fdc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 04/25 12:53 PM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: TRIAL DATE SET FOR 1/12/2026 09:30 AM IN Courtroom 3G BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 1/13/2026 09:30 AM IN Courtroom 3G BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 1/14/2026 09:30 AM IN Courtroom 3G BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW. (tjd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
25 25 minutes Settlement Conference Wed 03/26 1:32 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS Settlement Conference held on 3/26/25. (JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
24 24 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/13 10:11 AM
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES23 IS GRANTED. A STATUS TELECONFERENCE IS SET FOR 4/22/25 AT 1:00 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW. ALL FACT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 4/3/25. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW ON 2/12/25. 2/13/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
23 23 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 02/12 12:12 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by MTD PRODUCTS, INC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER, INC..Ceritifcate of Service.(Coyne, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 01/27 2:07 PM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 3/26/25 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 1/27/25. 1/27/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 01/21 3:41 PM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER IS REFERRED TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS FOR THE PURPOSE OF SCHEDULING AND CONDUCTING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW ON 1/21/25. 1/21/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
20 20 order Scheduling Order Fri 11/22 12:25 PM
FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES19 IS GRANTED. THE FOLLOWING DEADLINES SHALL APPLY: 1. On January 7, 2025, counsel shall advise the Court of the status of settlement discussions and if a settlement conference would be productive. 2. A status teleconference is scheduled for March 5, 2025, at 1:00 PM. The call-in information will be emailed to counsel by chambers. 3. By February 18, 2025, all fact discovery will be served, noticed, and completed. 4. By February 18, 2025, Plaintiffs counsel shall serve on defense counsel any expert reports as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2)(B). 5. By March 20, 2025, defense counsel shall serve on Plaintiffs counsel any rebuttal expert reports. 6. The Courts August 22, 2024 Scheduling Order (Doc. 18) is hereby VACATED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW ON 11/22/24. 11/22/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 11/20 11:12 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by JARON GEORGE, RACHEL E. GEORGE.Certification,certificate of service.(PAYNE, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 08/22 3:38 PM
ORDER THAT A STATUS TELECONFERENCE IS SET FOR 1/9/25 AT 1:00 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW. ALL FACT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 12/20/24. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW ON 8/22/24. 8/22/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
17 17 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Thu 08/22 3:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW. Re: A Pretrial Conference was held on 8/22/24. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 08/08 3:16 PM
ORDER THAT A TELECONFERENCE IS SET FOR 8/22/24 AT 2:00 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW ON 8/8/24. 8/8/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
15 15 order Consent and Order to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 08/07 3:48 PM
CONSENT AND ORDER TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG M. STRAW. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 8/7/24 8/7/24. 8/7/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Assignment Sheet
14 14 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge (Not Social Security) Wed 08/07 10:46 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by MTD PRODUCTS, INC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER, INC... (MUHA, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
notice Notice re: Cancellation of Hearing Wed 08/07 10:49 AM
NOTICE re: Cancellation of Hearing - Rule 16 Conference, scheduled for 8/8/2024 at 1:30pm(sfl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/06 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard T. Coyne on behalf of MTD PRODUCTS, INC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER, INC. (Coyne, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
12 12 misc Report Of Thu 08/01 3:59 PM
Report Of 26(f) Meeting by MTD PRODUCTS, INC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER, INC.. (MUHA, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
notice Notice of Hearing Wed 07/31 1:03 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/8/2024 01:30 PM IN Telephone Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT. Counsel will receive call-in information via email. (sfl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
11 11 misc Letter Tue 07/30 10:31 AM
Letter dated July 30, 2024 by MTD PRODUCTS, INC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER, INC.. (MUHA, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/10 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A. MUHA on behalf of MTD PRODUCTS, INC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER, INC. (MUHA, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 07/10 10:41 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING. RE: A FRCP 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 8/8/24 AT 1:30 PM IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 5614) BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Fillable form
Monday, July 08, 2024
8 8 misc State Court Record - Attachment Mon 07/08 4:13 PM
State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County cv, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
7 7 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Wed 05/22 2:40 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including The Vanguard Group, Inc. and T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. by STANLEY BLACK & DECKER, INC..(BODE, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]
6 6 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Wed 05/22 2:39 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. by MTD PRODUCTS, INC.(BODE, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/20 12:15 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by MTD PRODUCTS, INC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER, INC..(BODE, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
4 4 misc Affidavit Fri 05/17 12:38 PM
AFFIDAVIT Ratification Affidavit by JARON GEORGE, RACHEL E. GEORGE. (PAYNE, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
3 3 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Wed 05/15 11:41 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Allstate Insurance Company with Certificate of Service by JARON GEORGE, RACHEL E. GEORGE.(PAYNE, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/13 4:58 PM
NOTICE by MTD PRODUCTS, INC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER, INC. Designation Form (BODE, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Attorney) Mon 05/13 1:18 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MTD PRODUCTS, INC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER, INC. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17461917), filed by MTD PRODUCTS, INC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER, INC..(BODE, FREDERICK) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/13/2024) (sbt). NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MTD PRODUCTS, INC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER, INC. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17461917), filed by MTD PRODUCTS, INC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER, INC..(BODE, FREDERICK) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/13/2024) (sbt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit State Court Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit State Court Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal
misc Attorney Required Forms Mon 05/13 1:37 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. DEFENDANT's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. The Certification Question asking if the case is/is not needs to be answered. (sbt)
Related: [-]