Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean D Jordan
Case #: 4:24-cv-00429
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 13, 2024
Terminated:Jun 11, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 10, 2024 2:50 AM CST
Defendant
Whatabrands LLC
Represented By
Kristopher L Reed
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Communication Interface Technologies, LLC
Represented By
Trevor James Beaty
Shea Beaty
contact info


Docket last updated: 86 minutes ago
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/11 10:03 AM
NOTICE: Notice of Dismissal: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), and following the submission of (Dkt. #7), this civil case is dismissed with prejudice. The clerk will close and terminate this matter. (ldm)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 06/10 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristopher L Reed on behalf of Whatabrands LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Kristopher
7 7 motion Dismiss Mon 06/10 1:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Communication Interface Technologies, LLC.(Beaty, Trevor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 07, 2024
6 6 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Fri 06/07 4:20 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Communication Interface Technologies, LLC.(Beaty, Trevor)
Related: [-]
text Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Fri 06/07 4:32 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Whatabrands LLC to 7/1/2024. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(dlw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/28 1:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Communication Interface Technologies, LLC. Whatabrands LLC served on 5/17/2024. (Beaty, Trevor)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 05/13 3:06 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Whatabrands LLC. (jmb)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 05/13 2:14 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Communication Interface Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equitable IP Corporation for Communication Interface Technologies, LLC. (Beaty, Trevor)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 05/13 2:13 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Beaty, Trevor)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/13 2:11 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Whatabrands LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10134991.), filed by Communication Interface Technologies, LLC.(Beaty, Trevor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 05/13 2:22 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (jmb)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 05/13 2:22 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (jmb)
Related: [-]