Florida Southern District Court
Judge:William P Dimitrouleas
Case #: 1:24-cv-21853
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:May 13, 2024
Terminated:Jul 26, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 09, 2024 5:13 AM EST
Defendant
Risto Express LLC
Plaintiff
Victor Ariza
Represented By
Pelayo M. Duran
Law Office Of Pelayo Duran, PA
contact info
Roderick Victor Hannah
Roderick V. Hannah, Esq., P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, July 26, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Fri 07/26 4:19 PM
ORDER APPROVING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Dismissing Case / Closing Case. (With Prejudice) Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Fri 07/26 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Victor Ariza (Hannah, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
8 8 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 07/03 11:02 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Victor Ariza. Risto Express LLC served on 6/28/2024, response/answer due 7/19/2024. (Hannah, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
7 7 notice Certificate of Counsel Wed 05/15 5:35 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re6 Certificate of Counsel,5 Order of Requirements (Corrected) by Roderick Victor Hannah on behalf of Victor Ariza (Hannah, Roderick)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Certificate of Counsel Wed 05/15 3:26 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re5 Order of Requirements (Verified Certificate Regarding Prior ADA Filings) by Roderick Victor Hannah on behalf of Victor Ariza (Hannah, Roderick)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs order Order of Requirements Wed 05/15 2:46 PM
Order Requiring Certificate of Counsel regarding any Prior Filings under the Americans with Disabilities Act, by 5/20/2024. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Wed 05/15 2:44 PM
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 05/14 8:42 AM
Summons Issued as to Risto Express LLC. (ar24)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 05/14 8:36 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ar24)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/13 5:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Risto Express LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17525138, filed by Victor Ariza.(Hannah, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Summon(s)