Minnesota District Court
Judge:Jeffrey M Bryan
Referred: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Case #: 0:24-cv-01732
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 13, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 09, 2024 4:06 AM CST
Defendant
Randy Cagle, Jr.
Defendant
Rogeric Hankins
Defendant
Inmate Services Corporation
Defendant
Ramsey County, Minnesota
Represented By
Scott A Benson
Briol& Benson, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Seelig
Represented By
Zane A. Umsted
Madia Law LLC
contact info
J Ashwin Madia
Madia Law LLC
contact info

GPO Mar 17 2025
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Dismiss/General. See Order for specifics. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan on 3/17/2025. (LIA)

Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
37 37 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Tue 03/18 2:56 PM
ORDER/NOTICE OF SCHEDULING: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 4/4/2025. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/11/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2025 at 11:00 AM in Audio-only Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 3/18/2025.(TMA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
Monday, March 17, 2025
36 36 22 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/General Mon 03/17 9:21 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part21 Motion to Dismiss/General. See Order for specifics. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan on 3/17/2025. (LIA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
35 35 respm Response Wed 03/12 4:06 PM
RESPONSE re33 Notice (Other) filed by Ramsey County, Minnesota.(Benson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
34 34 order Order for Party to File Document/Respond to Court Fri 03/07 11:14 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER: Counsel for Defendant Ramsey County contacted chambers with a request to respond to Plaintiff's filing of Supplemental Authority33 . That request is GRANTED and Defendant may file on or before March 12, 2025. Ordered by Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan on 3/7/2025. (LIA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
33 33 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/27 11:19 AM
NOTICE by Jennifer Seelig re21 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Complaint -Notice of Supplemental Authority-(Umsted, Zane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Doe 601 Slip Opinion
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
32 32 order Order for Party to File Document/Respond to Court Wed 02/26 3:56 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER: Counsel for Plaintiff requested leave to file supplemental authority in support of Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant Ramsey County's pending motion to dismiss21 . The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's counsel's request. Plaintiff's counsel may file any supplemental authority by or before March 3, 2025. Ordered by Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan on 2/26/2025. (LIA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
31 31 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 10/01 5:08 PM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan on 10/1/2024: Oral Arguments Motion Hearing. Court Reporter: Nancy Meyer St. Paul Courthouse, Courtroom 3A Time: 11:05 11:51 Total Time: 46 mins. APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff(s): J. Ashwin Madia; Zane A. Umsted For Defendant(s): Scott A. Benson PROCEEDINGS: Hearing on: 21 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Complaint filed by Ramsey County, Minnesota. The motion was moved, argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (LIA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
30 30 respm Reply Memorandum or Notice of No Reply to Response to Motion Tue 09/24 8:59 PM
Reply to Response to Motion re21 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Complaint filed by Ramsey County, Minnesota.(Benson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
29 29 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Tue 09/10 11:31 AM
DECLARATION of Zane Umsted in Opposition to21 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Complaint filed by Jennifer Seelig.(Umsted, Zane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) P-1
28 28 26 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 09/10 11:29 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re21 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Complaint filed by Jennifer Seelig.(Umsted, Zane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
27 27 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Tue 08/20 4:52 PM
Declaration of Megan Schaefer in Support of21 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Complaint filed by Ramsey County, Minnesota.(Benson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1
26 26 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Tue 08/20 4:50 PM
Declaration of Scott A Benson in Support of21 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Complaint filed by Ramsey County, Minnesota.(Benson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
25 25 misc Meet and Confer Statement Tue 08/20 4:43 PM
MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re21 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Ramsey County, Minnesota.(Benson, Scott)
Related: [-]
24 24 respm Proposed Order to Judge re Motion Tue 08/20 4:42 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re21 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Complaint filed by Ramsey County, Minnesota.(Benson, Scott)
Related: [-]
23 23 20 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 08/20 4:40 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re21 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Complaint filed by Ramsey County, Minnesota.(Benson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
22 22 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Tue 08/20 4:37 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION21 MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan. (Benson, Scott)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Dismiss/General Tue 08/20 4:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss/General First Amended Complaint filed by Ramsey County, Minnesota. (Benson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
20 20 service Certificate of Service Tue 07/30 2:02 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jennifer Seelig re1 Complaint,3 Summons Issued Declaration of Zane Umsted(Umsted, Zane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) "Service of Process Acknowledgement",
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) "Certificate of Service for Service By Mail"
19 19 order Briefing Order Tue 07/30 12:20 PM
(Text-Only) BRIEFING ORDER: Defendant's Response to Amended Complaint due on or before 8/20/2024. Plaintiff's Response due on or before 9/10/2024. Defendant's Reply due on or before 9/24/2024. Ordered by Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan on 7/30/2024. (LIA)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
18 18 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Mon 07/29 3:41 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re17 Stipulation. (Benson, Scott)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Stipulation Mon 07/29 3:40 PM
STIPULATION by Ramsey County, Minnesota. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff. (Benson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 07/15 9:45 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants. filed by Jennifer Seelig. No summons requested. (Umsted, Zane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Redlined First Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) F,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) G
Friday, June 28, 2024
15 15 respm Proposed Order to Judge re Motion Fri 06/28 11:44 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re10 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Ramsey County, Minnesota.(Benson, Scott)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 06/28 11:40 AM
Declaration of Scott A Benson in Support of10 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Ramsey County, Minnesota.(Benson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s)
13 13 16 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 06/28 11:37 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re10 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Ramsey County, Minnesota.(Benson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
12 12 misc Meet and Confer Statement Fri 06/28 11:31 AM
MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re10 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Ramsey County, Minnesota.(Benson, Scott)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Fri 06/28 11:29 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION10 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan. (Benson, Scott)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss/General Fri 06/28 11:23 AM
MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Ramsey County, Minnesota. (Benson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order of Entry Fri 06/21 3:08 PM
ORDER: Defendant Ramsey County shall file its Motion to Dismiss or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before June 28, 2024; Plaintiff Jennifer Seelig shall file her response to the County's Motion to Dismiss on or before July 31, 2024; Ramsey County shall file its reply brief on or before August 14, 2024. Signed by Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan on 6/21/2024. (LIA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 06/18 9:37 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, filed by Ramsey County, Minnesota.(Benson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, June 17, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/17 1:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Seelig. Rogeric Hankins served on 6/7/2024, answer due 6/28/2024.(MKB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, June 14, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/14 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A Benson on behalf of Ramsey County, Minnesota. (Benson, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/13 1:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Seelig. Ramsey County, Minnesota served on 5/24/2024, answer due 6/14/2024. (Umsted, Zane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
4 4 order Order/Notice to Attorney Wed 06/05 12:19 PM
ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. The Court has reviewed plaintiff Jennifer Seeligs complaint, as is required under 28 U.S.C. § 1915A. Each defendant upon whom service of process is properly effected will be required to file an answer or other responsive pleading, notwithstanding the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g). Seelig remains responsible for effecting service of process in this matter. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/5/2024.(TMA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 05/14 8:19 AM
Summons Issued as to Randy Cagle, Jr, Rogeric Hankins, Inmate Services Corporation, Ramsey County, Minnesota. (ACH)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Tue 05/14 8:18 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan per Civil (3rd, 4th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 24-cv-1732 JMB/ECW. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/13 3:38 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 405, receipt number CMNDC-11047249) filed by Jennifer Seelig. Filer requests summons issued. (Umsted, Zane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) G,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet