Maryland District Court
Judge:Gina L Simms
Case #: 8:24-cv-01390
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:May 13, 2024
Case in other court:Circuit Court for Prince George's County, C-16-CV-24-002477
Last checked: Sunday Nov 10, 2024 3:42 AM EST
Defendant
Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
One Bala Plaza, Ste. 100 P.O. Box 950
Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004
Represented By
Margaret Fonshell Ward
Downs Ward Bender Herzog & Kintigh, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Shelba Coleman
Represented By
David A Muncy
Plaxen And Adler PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 79 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
21 21 3 pgs order Order for Settlement Conference Wed 04/09 2:32 PM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference on 9/30/2025 at 10:00 a.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 4/9/2025. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 04/04 1:22 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jillyn K Schulze for Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 4/4/2025. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Scheduling Order Fri 04/04 11:18 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Joint Status Report due by 7/31/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 4/4/2025. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/04 4:23 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi for Mediation. Magistrate Judge Jillyn K Schulze no longer assigned to the case. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
18 18 misc Status Report Thu 04/03 1:05 PM
STATUS REPORT Supplemental Joint by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company(Ward, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
17 17 order Order Wed 03/26 9:58 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court is in receipt of16 , in which the parties mention that "given the complexity of the medical and legal issues requiring expert review, the parties have not been able to complete discovery as anticipated". The Court's understanding is that the deadlines for all expert-related discovery and requests for admission have been stayed. See 15 . Accordingly, by no later than April 4, 2025, the parties shall file a supplemental Joint Status Report clarifying whether they have been engaging in expert discovery and whether the Amended Scheduling Order that they seek needs to include deadlines related to experts and requests for admissions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 3/26/2025. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
16 16 misc Status Report Mon 03/24 4:09 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company(Ward, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 08/28 5:29 PM
Rule 16 telephone conference held on 8/28/2024 before Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms. PAPERLESS ORDER: For the reasons articulated during the Rule 16 telephone conference, the parties' Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order has been GRANTED. The deadline for the close of fact discovery and submission of a Joint Status Report is March 31, 2025. The deadline for the filing of notice(s) of intent to file dispositive pre-trial motions is April 30, 2025. All expert-related discovery deadlines and the deadline for Requests for Admission are hereby STAYED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 8/28/2024. (dps, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Tue 08/13 7:59 AM
LETTER ORDER regarding the Rule 16 Telephone Conference scheduled for August 28, 2024 at 5pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 8/12/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Order Fri 08/09 11:43 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 12/27/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 8/9/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order Thu 08/08 2:46 PM
LETTER ORDER REGARDING THE FILING OF MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 8/8/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
11 11 21 pgs order Order Thu 08/08 2:44 PM
DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 8/8/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 08/05 4:04 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms for All Further Proceedings. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/5/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
9 9 corresp Magistrate Judge - consent/decline Mon 08/05 1:56 PM
Consent to Magistrate Judge (Ward, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/30 10:52 AM
NOTICE by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company re5 Amended Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions (Ward, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/24 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David A Muncy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Muncy, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
6 6 corresp Miscellaneous Tue 05/14 9:17 AM
Correspondence sent to Attorney for Plaintiff re: Removal of Civil Action. (c/m 5/14/2024 bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
5 5 notice Amended Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Tue 05/14 9:05 AM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (c/m 5/14/2024 bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint Tue 05/14 8:59 AM
COMPLAINT against Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, filed by Shelba Coleman.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Mon 05/13 5:20 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine North America, Inc. for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Ward, Margaret)
Related: [-]
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/13 5:18 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Ward, Margaret)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 05/13 5:15 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number C-16-CV-24-001378. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11259218), filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Ward, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit state court pleadings,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Jury Demand Tue 05/14 9:03 AM
Jury Trial Demand by Shelba Coleman(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Remark - State Court Docs Tue 05/14 9:05 AM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENT (4) IS A COPY OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]