Texas Western District Court
Judge:Orlando L Garcia
Referred: Elizabeth S Chestney
Case #: 5:24-cv-00487
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:May 13, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 09, 2024 4:47 AM CST
Defendant
Sienna Marketing & Consulting Inc.,
Represented By
Robert P. Scott
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Bobbye E Pyke
Blank Rome
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Ortega
Represented By
Paulina Almanza
Almanza Terrazas PLLC
contact info

GPO Mar 04 2025
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sienna Marketing & Consulting Inc.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (vl)
GPO Mar 21 2025
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 25 Report and Recommendations, Status Report Order, GRANTING IN PART AND DENIED IN PART 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sienna Marketing & Consulting Inc.,. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (bt)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
38 38 order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Wed 05/14 10:40 AM
ORDER DENYING36 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (vl)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
37 37 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/12 7:45 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Sienna Marketing & Consulting Inc.,, re36 Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration re33 Order, Set Hearings filed by Plaintiff Mark Anthony Ortega (Scott, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
36 36 motion Reconsideration Fri 05/02 3:47 PM
Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration re33 Order, Set Hearings by Mark Anthony Ortega.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Ortega, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
35 35 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 05/02 3:40 PM
RESPONSE to31 Order to Show Cause by Mark Anthony Ortega. (Ortega, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
34 34 order Protective Order Thu 05/01 12:45 PM
CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
33 33 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 05/01 12:42 PM
ORDER Setting Statis Conference and Granting Oral Motion for entry of Protective Order, ( Status Conference set for 7/25/2025 01:00 PM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Scheduling Order Thu 05/01 12:31 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2026 10:30 AM before Judge Orlando L. Garcia, Jury Selection & Trial set for 9/21/2026 9:30AM before Judge Orlando L. Garcia, ADR Report Deadline due by 5/1/2026, ADR Mediation Completed by 5/1/2026, Amended Pleadings due by 9/10/2025, Discovery due by 4/3/2026, Motions due by 5/15/2026,. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
31 31 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 05/01 12:17 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Mark Anthony Ortega. Show Cause Response due by 5/14/2025,. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/01 12:44 PM
ORDER GRANTING [ORAL] Motion for Entry of Protective Order (found in document #33) Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
30 30 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 04/29 11:05 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/28/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Zoom Recording.)(bt)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/28 6:05 AM
Text Order GRANTING29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
29 29 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/25 1:57 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert P. Scott ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-20098117) by on behalf of Sienna Marketing & Consulting Inc.,.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Scott, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 21, 2025
28 28 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Mon 04/21 5:13 PM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan (Joint) by Sienna Marketing & Consulting Inc.,. (Scott, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
27 27 2 pgs order Order Adopting/Rejecting Report and Recommendations Mon 03/24 4:54 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for25 Report and Recommendations, Status Report Order, GRANTING IN PART AND DENIED IN PART12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sienna Marketing & Consulting Inc.,. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (bt)
Related: [-]
26 26 5 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 03/21 4:36 PM
ORDER Setting Initial Pretrial Conference Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2025 3:00 PM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bt)
Related: [-]
motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/01 12:39 PM
ORAL MOTION for Entry of Protective Order by Sienna Marketing & Consulting Inc.,.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
25 25 misc Report and Recommendations Status Report Order Wed 03/05 8:57 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sienna Marketing & Consulting Inc.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (vl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Electronic Filing Wed 02/05 3:47 PM
ORDER GRANTING21 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (bt)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 01/31 4:15 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Elizabeth S. Chestney. (vl)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 01/31 11:28 AM
Text Order GRANTING16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Paulina Almanza is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel for Plaintiff. Entered by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ROlc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
21 21 motion Electronic Filing Thu 01/30 2:43 PM
Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Mark Ortega. (vl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
22 22 order Sealed Order Thu 01/30 4:30 PM
Sealed EX PARTE Order. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (bt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
20 20 misc Sealed Document Fri 01/17 10:43 AM
Sealed Document filed (bt) (Main Document 20 replaced on 1/17/2025) (bt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Thu 01/16 2:08 PM
Text Order GRANTING19 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. The Clerk is directed to file counsel's declaration and attached exhibits in support of her motion to withdraw UNDER SEAL. Entered by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nm)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
19 19 motion Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Mon 01/13 12:27 PM
Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Almanza, Paulina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement SEALED DOCUMENT,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, January 03, 2025
order Order Fri 01/03 3:18 PM
It is ORDERED that on or before Monday, January 13, 2025, counsel for Plaintiff shall submit additional information to supplement her motion to withdraw. She may do so via a motion for leave to file under seal. Entered by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nm)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Fri 01/03 3:23 PM
Text Order GRANTING18 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Plaintiff's motion and the exhibits attached thereto shall remain under seal. Entered by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nm)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
18 18 motion Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document Tue 10/29 10:17 AM
Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (mgr)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Response Tue 10/29 10:17 AM
REPLY IN OPPOISITION to16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Mark Ortega. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
16 16 motion Withdraw As Attorney Wed 10/23 7:11 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Mark Ortega.(Almanza, Paulina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
15 15 notice Notice Wed 10/02 12:59 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Sienna Marketing & Consulting Inc., (Pyke, Bobbye)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
14 14 9 pgs respm Response in Support of Motion Wed 08/21 1:41 PM
RESPONSE in Support, filed by Sienna Marketing & Consulting Inc.,, re12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Sienna Marketing & Consulting Inc., (Scott, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
13 13 15 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 08/14 6:34 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Mark Ortega, re12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Sienna Marketing & Consulting Inc., (Almanza, Paulina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
12 12 13 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 07/31 3:35 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Sienna Marketing & Consulting Inc.,.(Scott, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 17 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 4 4 pgs Exhibit D,
Att: 5 1 pgs Proposed Order
Thursday, July 25, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 07/25 2:40 PM
ANSWER to9 Amended Complaint Plaintiff's 1st Amended Class Action Complaint by Sienna Marketing & Consulting Inc.,.(Scott, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
10 10 notice Notice Fri 07/19 10:19 AM
NOTICE OF INTENT TO AMEND CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Mark Ortega (Almanza, Paulina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 07/11 7:27 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sienna Marketing & Consulting Inc., amending1 Complaint., filed by Mark Ortega.(Almanza, Paulina)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 07/11 5:00 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint Plaintiff's Class Action by Sienna Marketing & Consulting Inc.,.(Scott, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
7 7 2 pgs notice Notice Fri 07/05 11:30 AM
NOTICE OF INTENT TO AMEND CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Mark Ortega (Almanza, Paulina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
6 6 misc Pro Hac Vice Letter Tue 06/11 9:59 AM
Pro Hac Vice Letter forwarded to attorney Jeffrey N. Rosenthal. (wg)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Pro Hac Vice Letter Tue 06/11 9:58 AM
Pro Hac Vice Letter forwarded to attorney Bobbye Pyke. (wg)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 06/11 1:24 PM
Text Order GRANTING4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant's answer or responsive pleading be submitted to the Court on or before Wednesday, July 10, 2024. Entered by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nm)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Wed 06/12 10:42 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Sienna Marketing & Consulting Inc., answer due 7/10/2024. (wg)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
4 4 3 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 06/07 12:47 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by Sienna Marketing & Consulting Inc.,.(Scott, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Deadline
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 05/15 11:36 AM
Summons Issued as to Sienna Marketing & Consulting Inc.,. (wg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/14 5:24 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Mark Ortega. (Almanza, Paulina)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/13 4:12 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18757224). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Mark Ortega.(Almanza, Paulina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 05/14 11:13 AM
Case assigned to Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Tue 05/14 11:14 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (wg)
Related: [-]