California Central District Court
Judge:John A Kronstadt
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:24-cv-03983
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud
Case Filed:May 13, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 09, 2024 2:08 AM PST
Defendant
Christopher Myers
Represented By
Margret Lavin Flodeen
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Kimberly Gene Allen Dennis
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Blake L. Osborn
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Tara Siener
Represented By
M Laurie Murphy
Valensi Rose PLC
contact info
Katharine Brittney Kiyomi Lau
Valensi Rose, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/25 2:50 PM
Notice of Filing Certified Copy of Creditor Zachary Kaufman's Money Judgment filed by Creditor Zachary Kaufmann.(Pugh, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certified Copy of Money Judgment
26 26 notice Notice of Lien Fri 04/25 2:45 PM
NOTICE OF LIEN filed by Creditor Zachary Kaufmann. (Pugh, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
25 25 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 03/18 11:39 AM
ORDER CONTINUING STAY AND SETTING DATE FOR FURTHER REPORT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Based on a review of the parties' Joint Report Regarding Sale of Property (Dkt.24 ), good cause has been shown to extend the stay of this action, and it shall remain in place until September 3, 2025. The parties shall file a joint report on the earlier of every 60 days, or within ten days of a material development in connection with either the planned sale of the property or as to potential settlement of this matter. The Status Conference is continued from March 24, 2025, to September 1, 2025. The parties shall file a joint report no later than August 22, 2025, regarding their collective and/or respective positions as to a further continuation of the stay. Based on a review of the joint report, a determination will be made whether to continue the Status Conference, vacate the Status Conference or proceed with the Status Conference. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sea)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
24 24 misc Status Report Mon 03/17 3:35 PM
STATUS REPORT re: Sale of Property (Joint) filed by Plaintiff Tara Siener. (Lau, Katharine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
23 23 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 01/30 4:34 PM
ORDER CONTINUING STAY AND SETTING DATE FOR FURTHER REPORT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Based on a review of the parties' Joint Report Regarding Sale of Property (Dkt.22 ), good cause has been shown to extend the stay of this action, and it shall remain in place until April 1, 2025. A Status Conference is set for March 24, 2024. The parties shall file a joint report no later than March 17, 2025, regarding any developments in the sale of the property and their collective and/or respective positions as to a further continuation of the stay. Based on a review of the joint report, a determination will be made whether to continue the Status Conference, vacate the Status Conference or proceed with the Status Conference. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
22 22 misc Status Report Tue 01/28 4:13 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint re: Sale of Property filed by Plaintiff Tara Siener. (Lau, Katharine)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
21 21 misc Declaration Mon 01/27 10:05 PM
DECLARATION of Katharine B. Lau re Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 20 and Submission of Joint Status Report filed by Plaintiff Tara Siener. (Lau, Katharine)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
20 20 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 01/17 11:33 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL TO FILE JOINT REPORT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: On August 6, 2024, an order issued staying this action and directing the parties to file a joint report on the earlier of every 60 days, or within ten days of a material development in connection with either the planned sale of the property or as to potential settlement of this matter (Dkt.16 ). The second report was due no later than January 8, 2025. No report was filed. The parties shall file a joint report on or before January 27, 2025. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sea)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
19 19 misc Status Report Fri 11/08 5:16 PM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) RE: SALE OF PROPERTY filed by Plaintiff Tara Siener. (Lau, Katharine)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
18 18 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 11/04 10:33 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL TO FILE JOINT REPORT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: On August 6, 2024, an order issued staying this action and directing the parties to file a joint report on the earlier of every 60 days, or within ten days of a material development in connection with either the planned sale of the property or as to potential settlement of this matter (Dkt.16 ). The first report was due no later than October 8, 2024. No report was filed. The parties shall file a joint report on or before November 8, 2024. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 08/07 3:35 PM
ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION FOR LIMITED STAY OF ACTION PENDING SALE OF PROPERTY (DKT.16 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The action is stayed in its entirety until February 1, 2025, to allow time for the parties to effect the sale of the property; All present dates and deadlines in this matter are vacated; The parties shall file a joint report on the earlier of every 60 days, or within ten days of a material development in connection with either the planned sale of the property or as to the potential settlement of this matter, with the first report due no later than October 8, 2024; This Order is without prejudice to an application by either party to lift the stay prior to February 1, 2025; and the parties reserve all of their respective rights and defenses relating to the action, including the right to seek further stays of this action. This joint stipulation does not represent a waiver of any such rights or defenses, including the right to bring dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
16 16 stip Stay Case Fri 08/02 3:47 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Sale of Property filed by Defendant Christopher Myers.(Osborn, Blake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 25, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Extending Answer Due Deadline Thu 07/25 2:03 PM
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT (DKT.14 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Based on a review of the Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint (the Stipulation (Dkt. 14)), sufficient good cause has been shown for the requested relief. Therefore, the Stipulation is APPROVED. Defendants deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended from July 23, 2024, to August 13, 2024. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
14 14 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Tue 07/23 3:03 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 8/13/2024 filed by Defendant Christopher Myers.(Osborn, Blake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
13 13 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Wed 07/10 1:48 PM
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT12 , Defendant Christopher Myers answer due 7/23/2024 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Defendant's deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended from July 9, 2024, to July 23, 2024. (es)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
12 12 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Mon 07/08 4:41 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 23, 2024 re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by defendant Christopher Myers.(Osborn, Blake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 14, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Extending Answer Due Deadline Mon 06/17 1:38 PM
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT (DKT.10 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Based on a review of the Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint (the Stipulation (Dkt. 10)), sufficient good cause has been shown for the requested relief. Therefore, the Stipulation is APPROVED. Defendants deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended from June 18, 2024, to July 9, 2024. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
10 10 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 06/13 5:07 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Christopher Myers answer now due 7/9/2024, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by defendant Christopher Myers.(Osborn, Blake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 20, 2024
9 9 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 05/20 1:10 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Christopher Myers answer now due 6/18/2024, filed by Defendant Christopher Myers.(Osborn, Blake)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
8 8 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 05/16 9:36 AM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/13/2024. (tj)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 05/16 9:21 AM
STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 05/14 2:06 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 05/14 2:05 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 05/14 2:05 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 05/13 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Christopher Myers, (Osborn, Blake)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 05/13 3:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Christopher Myers. (Osborn, Blake)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 05/13 3:46 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 24TRCV00567 Receipt No: ACACDC-37459937 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Christopher Myers. (Attorney Blake L. Osborn added to party Christopher Myers(pty:dft))(Osborn, Blake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 ADR Packet,
Att: 4 Notice of Case Assignment,
Att: 5 Notice of Case Management Conference,
Att: 6 Proof of Service of Substituted Service,
Att: 7 Affidavit of Due Diligence,
Att: 8 Declaration of Blake L. Osborn,
Att: 9 Declaration of Christopher Myers
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 05/14 2:15 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, incl., Christopher Myers., filed by plaintiff Tara Siener. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/16/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 05/14 2:19 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tara Siener, upon Defendant Christopher Myers served on 3/29/2024, answer due 4/19/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Stiefel Hanna, Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/8/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO DECLARATION OF BLAKE L. OSBORN) (ghap)
Related: [-]