New York Southern District Court
Judge:Laura Taylor Swain
Case #: 1:24-cv-03648
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:May 08, 2024
Terminated:Oct 03, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 04, 2024 3:51 AM EST
Defendant
Africa Citizen Cled Dorvil, LLC
Defendant
U.S. Customs
Defendant
U.S. Immigration Dept.
Defendant
U.S.H.L.S.
Defendant
E.K.R. Realty Inc.
Defendant
Reginald Ferguson
Defendant
Loan Funder LLC
Defendant
MERS Inc. Business
Plaintiff
Clinton C. Barlow, III
292 Spring Street 3rd Floor
Trenton, NJ 08618


Docket last updated: 82 minutes ago
Friday, October 18, 2024
misc Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer) Fri 10/18 9:22 AM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - District of New Jersey acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 3:24-cv-09893, filed on 10/18/2024. (vba)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Thu 10/10 8:51 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 4. Mailed to: Clinton C. Barlow III 292 Spring Street 3rd Floor Trenton, NJ 08618. (ak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
4 4 5 pgs order Order Wed 10/09 10:05 AM
TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes the case in this court. If Plaintiff engages in frivolous litigation in this court, he will be ordered to show cause why a filing injunction should not be imposed. 28 U.S.C. § 1651. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/3/2024) (sgz)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer Thu 10/17 10:33 AM
CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of New Jersey.(sgz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment - Sua Sponte Wed 08/28 4:45 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Tue 05/14 2:48 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: Clinton C. Barlow III 292 Spring Street 3rd Floor Trenton, NJ 08618. (sha)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
3 3 order Standing Order re Cases Filed By Pro Se Plaintiffs Mon 05/13 12:27 PM
STANDING ORDER IN RE CASES FILED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFFS (See 24-MISC-127 Standing Order filed March 18, 2024). To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a party's obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information. Parties may[LINK:consent to electronic service] to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for[LINK:permission to file documents electronically] . Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the court's electronic docket. A notice directing the parties' attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the court's records. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/18/24) (rdz)
Related: [-]
service Note Regarding Service on Self-Represented Party Mon 05/13 12:27 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT NOTE: For each electronic filing made in a case involving a self-represented party who has not consented to electronic service, the filing party must serve the document on such self-represented party in a manner permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2) (other than through the ECF system) and file proof of service for each document so served. Please see[LINK:Rule 9.2] of the courts ECF Rules & Instructions for further information..(rdz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
2 2 misc Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/13 10:44 AM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Clinton C. Barlow, III..(rdz)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/13 10:42 AM
COMPLAINT against Africa Citizen Cled Dorvil, LLC, U.S. Customs, U.S. Immigration Dept., U.S.H.L.S.. Document filed by Clinton C. Barlow, III..(rdz)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 05/13 10:42 AM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
Related: [-]