Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Timothy J Corrigan
Referred: Patricia D Barksdale
Case #: 3:24-cv-00485
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
CauseAmericans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:May 13, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 09, 2024 5:11 AM EST
Defendant
Wounded Warrior Project, Inc.
4899 Belfort Roa Suite 300
Jacksonville, FL 32256
Represented By
Ross Daniel Vickers
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info
Benjamin D. Sharkey
Jackson Lewis, PC
contact info
Mediator
William E. Adams, Jr.
Represented By
William E. Adams, Jr.
Adams Dispute Resolution LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Christy Montoto
Represented By
Kevin James Kapusta
Kevin Kapusta
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Mediator
Kirsten Doolittle
Terminated: 09/09/2024
Represented By
Kirsten L. Doolittle
Law Office Of Kirsten Doolittle, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
55 55 answer Answer to amended complaint Mon 04/28 10:08 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 53 Amended Complaint by Wounded Warrior Project, Inc..(Vickers, Ross)
Related: [-]