Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas W Thrash, Jr
Case #: 1:24-cv-02083
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:May 13, 2024
Terminated:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Nov 09, 2024 5:16 AM EST
Defendant
Charles Petersen
Defendant
Soho Capital Management, LLC
Defendant
Soho Income Advisors LLC
Plaintiff
Hyperpath Technologies, LLC
Represented By
Alex Benjamin Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
James M. Hicks, III
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John McCorvey
Represented By
Alex Benjamin Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
James M. Hicks, III
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info

GPO Apr 28 2025
OPINION AND ORDER. Defendant Charles Petersen's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 9] is GRANTED and the Soho Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 12] is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/28/2025. (tcc)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
26 26 1 pgs misc Judgment - Clerk Tue 04/29 7:52 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT judgment entered dismissing action. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
25 25 15 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for More Definite Statement Mon 04/28 4:05 PM
OPINION AND ORDER. Defendant Charles Petersen's Motion to Dismiss [Doc.9 ] is GRANTED and the Soho Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Doc.12 ] is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/28/2025. (tcc)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 04/28 4:09 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend Fri 02/21 3:33 PM
ORDER denying20 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on this 21st day of February, 2025. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 01/31 5:06 PM
Submission of20 First MOTION to Amend Complaint to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jeh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
23 23 5 pgs respm Reply Brief Mon 01/27 9:21 PM
REPLY BRIEF re20 First MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by John McCorvey, Hyperpath Technologies, LLC.(Zimm, Christian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 48 pgs Supplement
Friday, January 24, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 01/24 1:53 PM
Submission of9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION for More Definite Statement,12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement to District Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jeh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
22 22 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 01/13 4:57 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 First MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Charles Petersen, Soho Income Advisors LLC, Soho Capital Management, LLC. (Hemmer, Austin)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 01/13 4:55 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement ,9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIMMOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Charles Petersen, Soho Income Advisors LLC, Soho Capital Management, LLC. (Hemmer, Austin)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
20 20 8 pgs motion Amend Mon 12/30 6:52 PM
First MOTION to Amend Complaint with Brief In Support by John McCorvey, Hyperpath Technologies, LLC. (Zimm, Christian)
Related: [-]
19 19 20 pgs respm Response to Motion Mon 12/30 6:49 PM
RESPONSE re12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement ,9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIMMOTION for More Definite Statement filed by John McCorvey, Hyperpath Technologies, LLC. (Zimm, Christian)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
18 18 13 pgs misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Fri 12/27 8:40 PM
First JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by John McCorvey, Hyperpath Technologies, LLC. (Zimm, Christian)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 12/20 3:35 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiffs John McCorvey and Hyperpath Technologies, LLC, shall have through and including Monday, December 30, 2024, to respond to Defendant Charles Petersens Motion to Dismiss and Defendants' Soho Income Advisors, LLC, and Soho Capital Management, LLC, Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/20/2024. (bmr)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Fri 12/20 1:27 PM
Clerk's Notation re15 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
16 16 8 pgs motion Extension of Time Wed 12/18 8:19 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time For Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by John McCorvey, Hyperpath Technologies, LLC. (Zimm, Christian)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/18 4:51 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by John McCorvey, Hyperpath Technologies, LLC. (Zimm, Christian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/17 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Gerard Zimm on behalf of John McCorvey, Hyperpath Technologies, LLC (Zimm, Christian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Thu 12/12 4:00 PM
Clerk's Notation re13 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
13 13 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/11 4:18 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Charles Petersen, Soho Income Advisors LLC, Soho Capital Management, LLC. (Hemmer, Austin)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 12/11 4:14 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement by Soho Income Advisors LLC, Soho Capital Management, LLC. (Hemmer, Austin)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 12/02 2:18 PM
ORDER: The Parties'10 Consent Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint is GRANTED. Defendants Soho Income Advisors, LLC and Soho Capital Management, LLC shall have through and including December 11, 2024, to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the Plaintiffs'1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/2/2024. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Wed 11/27 3:29 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, by Charles Petersen.(Hemmer, Austin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Time
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 11/27 3:25 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement with Brief In Support by Charles Petersen.(Hemmer, Austin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1. Stonegate Global Fund Administration, LLC Information Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2. Stonegate Global Capital Partners, LLC Information Sheet
Thursday, November 07, 2024
8 8 service Return of Service Executed Thu 11/07 4:26 PM
Return of Service Executed by John McCorvey. Soho Income Advisors LLC served on 11/6/2024, answer due 11/27/2024. (Kaufman, Alex)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Return of Service Executed Thu 11/07 4:24 PM
Return of Service Executed by John McCorvey. Soho Capital Management, LLC served on 11/6/2024, answer due 11/27/2024. (Kaufman, Alex)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Return of Service Executed Thu 11/07 4:23 PM
Return of Service Executed by John McCorvey. Charles Petersen served on 11/6/2024, answer due 11/27/2024. (Kaufman, Alex)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Return of Service Unexecuted Thu 11/07 4:13 PM
Return of Service Unexecuted by John McCorvey as to Soho Income Advisors LLC. (Kaufman, Alex)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Return of Service Unexecuted Thu 11/07 4:12 PM
Return of Service Unexecuted by John McCorvey as to Soho Capital Management, LLC. (Kaufman, Alex)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Return of Service Unexecuted Thu 11/07 4:10 PM
Return of Service Unexecuted by John McCorvey as to Charles Petersen. (Kaufman, Alex)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 05/14 9:23 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Charles Petersen, Soho Capital Management, LLC, Soho Income Advisors LLC.(bmr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Soho Income Advisors LLC,
Att: 2 Summons Soho Capital Management LLC
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/13 3:21 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by John McCorvey, Hyperpath Technologies, LLC. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13431151)(bmr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Civil Cover Sheet